This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 07:45:32 (UTC).

JERRY IGNACIO, ETAL VS ANTIOCH ICF,INC.,ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2012 JERRY IGNACIO, ETAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ANTIOCH ICF,INC ,ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Grandsaert, John L, BERGERON and STEVEN L. DYLINA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5770

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Grandsaert, John L

BERGERON

STEVEN L. DYLINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALPALLATOC, EMILIA

PALPALLATOC, FAUSTINO

IGNACIO, SHERLY

Defendants

ANTIOCH ICF, INC.

PUTNAM ICF

PUTNAM WEST

FRANCISCO ICF

SAN JUAN ICF

VERIDIANO, ROSEMARIE

TAMBOT, ROQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA

Defendant Attorney

CAMERLENGO, GEORGE F.

 

Court Documents

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SIGNED BY JUDGE BERGERON ON 11/13/12 FILED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF IGNACIO AS TO ANTIOCH ICF INC., BY SUB-SERVING RENE MALLARI, PERSON IN CHARGE. MAILING DATE OF 08/02/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF MARY PATRICIA HOUGH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APL. TO FILE1ST AMEN COMP

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (3) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JERRY IGNACIO JOSEPH IGNACIO, SHERLY IGNACIO.

Conversion Action.

COMPLAINT (2) Comment ACS: (U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF IGNACIO FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ORDER (2) Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 01/22/13

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, FILED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY JERRY IGNACIO JOSEPH IGNACIO, SHERLY IGNACIO, FAUSTINO P Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY JERRY IGNACIO, JOSEPH IGNACIO, SHERLY IGNACIO, FAUSTINO PALPALLATOC, EMILIA PALPALLATOC, PAMIE PALPALLATOC, FLORDELIZA PASCUAL, ROLANDO PASCUAL

Conversion Action.

PROOF OF SERVICE (QUESTIONABLE SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF IGNACIO AS TO DON V Comment PSQS: PROOF OF SERVICE (QUESTIONABLE SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF IGNACIO AS TO DON VERIDIANO ROSEMARIE VERIDIANO, ROQUE TAMBOT FILED. SERVICE QUESTIONABLE BECAUSE NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT NOT DATED.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 01/22/13 Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 01/22/13

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JERRY IGNACIO JOSEPH IGNACIO, SHERLY IGNACIO. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JERRY IGNACIO, JOSEPH IGNACIO, SHERLY IGNACIO.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JERRY IGNACIO. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JERRY IGNACIO.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; ROSETE, MARIANITRA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PASCUAL, ROLANDO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PASCUAL, FLORDELIZA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PALPALLATOC, PAMIE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PALPALLATOC, FAUSTINO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PALPALLATOC, EMILIA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; IGNACIO, SHERLY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; IGNACIO, JOSEPH; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; TAMBOT, ROQUE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; VERIDIANO, ROSEMARIE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; VERIDIANO, DON; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; SAN JUAN ICF; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; FRANCISCO ICF; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PUTNAM WEST; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PUTNAM ICF; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; ANTIOCH ICF, INC.; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; ROSETE, ROLANDO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; IGNACIO, JERRY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 08/16/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 12 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 12 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketSettlement Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF IGNACIO AS TO ANTIOCH ICF INC., BY SUB- Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF IGNACIO AS TO ANTIOCH ICF, INC., BY SUB-SERVING RENE MALLARI, PERSON IN CHARGE. MAILING DATE OF 08/02/12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for IGNACIO, JERRY; Case Payment Receipt # 201208020159 IGNACIO, JERRY $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for IGNACIO, JERRY; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; IGNACIO, JERRY; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/01/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120802-0159-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

m'\lO)Ul-th—lOCDCDNO)mAOOI\)—‘O

IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the parties, through their attorneys of record, that Plaintiffs may file the First Amended Complaint, which is attached hereto as Exhibit “A.” Thereafter, Defendants shall have thirty (30) days to respond to the Amended

Complaint.

Dated: October 5, 2012 CAMERLENGO & JOHNSON

GEORG% F. CAMERLEN:Z%

Attorney for Defendants

ANTIOCH ICF, INC. dba ANTIOCH ICF, PUTNAM ICF, PUTNAM WEST, FCRFf_ANCISCO ICF, and SAN JUAN ICF.

|0 Dated: October/’>,4)12 S & HOUGH

E. MOSS

MARY PATRICIA HOUGH

Attorneys for Plaintiffs JERRY IGNACIO, JOSEPH IGNACIO, SHERLY IGNACIO, EMILIA PALPALLATOC, FAUSTINO PALPALLATOC, PAMIE PALPALLATOC, FLORDELIZA PASCUAL, ROLANDO PASCUAL, MARIANITA ROSETE, and

YOLANDO ROSETE

ORDER

Upon proof being made to the satisfaction of the Court, and good cause appearing therefore, |

ITIS ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file the attached First Amended Complaint. Thereafter, Defendant(s) shall file a responsive pleading within thirty (30) days.

DATED: | ‘z13( (L

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA