This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 15:16:27 (UTC).

JENNIFER SHIN vs. CHI MAN POON, et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 JENNIFER SHIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHI MAN POON. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0602

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIN, JENNIFER

Defendants

POON, CHI MAN

CR WOODSIDE, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company

CR OPERATING, LLC, a New York limited liability company

CR FOUNDERS, LLC an Arizona limited liability company

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAUR, THOREY M

Defendant Attorneys

MORONEY, LINDA M.

OLMSTED, CHRISTOPHER W.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DEFENDANT CR WOODSIDE, LLC'S ANSWER Comment DEFENDANT, CR WOODSIDE, LLC'S ANSWER

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DEFENDANT CR OPERATING, LLC'S ANSWER Comment DEFENDANT, CR OPERATING, LLC'S ANSWER

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DEFENDANT CR FOUNDERS, LLC'S ANSWER Comment DEFENDANT, CR FOUNDERS, LLC'S ANSWER

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, ETC...

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CR FOUNDERS, LLC an Arizona limited liability company; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-016961-HOJ CR FOUNDERS, LLC an Arizona limited liability company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CR FOUNDERS, LLC an Arizona limited liability company; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; CR FOUNDERS, LLC an Arizona limited liability company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CR OPERATING, LLC, a New York limited liability company; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-016962-HOJ CR OPERATING, LLC, a New York limited liability company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CR OPERATING, LLC, a New York limited liability company; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; CR OPERATING, LLC, a New York limited liability company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CR WOODSIDE, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-016963-HOJ CR WOODSIDE, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CR WOODSIDE, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; CR WOODSIDE, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHIN, JENNIFER; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-006149-HOJ Shin, Jennifer $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHIN, JENNIFER; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; SHIN, JENNIFER; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CR Operating Company doing business as Landmark Towers is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLMSTED, CHRISTOPHER W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moroney, Linda Moin