This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 01:20:52 (UTC).

JENNIFER BANDELARIA VS THE CITY OF DALY CITY ETAL

Case Summary

On 01/07/2013 JENNIFER BANDELARIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE CITY OF DALY CITY ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A, Novak, Lisa A, Miram, George A., Novak, Lisa A., LISA A. NOVAK and GEORGE A. MIRAM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8925

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A

Novak, Lisa A

Miram, George A.

Novak, Lisa A.

LISA A. NOVAK

GEORGE A. MIRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANDELARIA, JENNIFER

Defendants

THE CITY OF DALY CITY

OTTOBONI, OFFICER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RENCHER, D.L.

Defendant Attorney

MASTER, TODD H.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF BANDELARIA SERVED ON OFFICER OTTOBONI WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/04/13.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF BANDELARIA FILED BY THE CITY OF DALY CITY OFFICER OTTOBONI, REPRESENTED BY TODD H. MASTER

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSBC: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF BANDELARIA SERVED ON THE CITY OF DALY CITY BY SERVING SYLVIA MOSQUEDA AGENT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/04/13

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION Comment SEAJ: STIPULATION TO EXTEND ARBITRATOR S JURISDICTION FROM 11/15/13 TO 01/31/14. SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 10/03/13.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (3) Comment NRA: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR UNTIMELY (REC'D VIA MAIL 8/06/13) FILED BY JENNIFER BANDELARIA

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JENNIFER BANDELARIA.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE CITY OF DALY CITY OFFICER OTTOBONI. Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE CITY OF DALY CITY, OFFICER OTTOBONI.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION TO EXTEND ARBITRATOR S JURISDICTION FROM 11/15/13 TO 01/31/14. SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLI Comment SEAJ: STIPULATION TO EXTEND ARBITRATOR S JURISDICTION FROM 11/15/13 TO 01/31/14. SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 10/03/13.

Conversion Action.

ARBITRATION (2) ARBITRATION (3) Comment ACOA: APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 08/22/13. ARBITRATOR: JAMES V. LEE. ARBITRATION HEARING DATE: 11/04/13.

Conversion Action.

ARBITRATION (2) ARBITRATION (3) Comment ACOA: APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 08/22/13. ARBITRATOR: JAMES V. LEE. ARBITRATION HEARING DATE: 11/04/13.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR UNTIMELY (REC'D VIA MAIL 8/06/13) FILED BY JENNIFER BANDELARIA Comment NRA: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR UNTIMELY (REC'D VIA MAIL 8/06/13) FILED BY JENNIFER BANDELARIA

Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator.

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED Comment NAA: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR NANCY LIGON DE ITA FILED BY THE CITY OF DALY CITY Comment NRA: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR NANCY LIGON DE ITA FILED BY THE CITY OF DALY CITY

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATORS PRINTED. Comment NPAP1: NOTICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATORS PRINTED.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE CITY OF DALY CITY OFFICER OTTOBONI. Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE CITY OF DALY CITY, OFFICER OTTOBONI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; OTTOBONI, OFFICER; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; THE CITY OF DALY CITY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; BANDELARIA, JENNIFER; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: PER ARB'R CASE SETTLED ON 1/21/14 PRIOR TO HEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • DocketArbitrator's fee statement received.; Additional Info: Comment ARBFS: ARBITRATOR`S FEE STATEMENT RECEIVED THIS DATE FROM JAMES V. LEE ($150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: ARBITRATION HEARING; 10:00 A.M. (COURTHOUSE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: PER COMM'N FROM ARB'R: HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 01/28/14 AT 1:00 P.M. (COURTHOUSE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: PER COMM'N FROM ARB'R: HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 01/07/14 AT 10:00 A.M. (COURTHOUSE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: STIPULATION TO EXTEND ARBITRATOR S JURISDICTION FROM 11/15/13 TO 01/31/14. SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLI Comment SEAJ: STIPULATION TO EXTEND ARBITRATOR S JURISDICTION FROM 11/15/13 TO 01/31/14. SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 10/03/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: FILE TO DEPT #7-CONTINUANCE REQUEST FORM SUBMITTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.; Additional Info: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY PRO/PER REMOVED AS TO JENNIFER BANDELARIA AND REPLA Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY PRO/PER REMOVED AS TO JENNIFER BANDELARIA AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY D.L. RENCHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for BANDELARIA, JENNIFER; Case Payment Receipt # 201301070653 BANDELARIA, JENNIFER $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for BANDELARIA, JENNIFER; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; BANDELARIA, JENNIFER; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130107-0653-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: Bandelaria v. City of Daly City, et al.

10. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached):

Motor Vehicle

General Negligence

Intentional Tort

Products Liability

Premises Liability

Other (specify):

11. Plaintiff has suffered a. | X ! wageloss .[ X'} loss of use of property . [X_ hospital and medical expenses . [ X general damage .| X7] property damage [X] loss of eaming capacity other damage (specify): Non-Economic damages, including but not limited to, pain and suffering, loss of enjoyment of life, inconvenience, and anxiety, in an amount to be determined at the time of trial.

@ ~o0oQao0C

12. The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationships of plaintiff to the deceased are

[-u—-—l a.l ' listed in Attachment 12. b | !

as follows:

13. The relief sought in this complaint is within the jurisdiction of this court. The damages are in excess of $25,000.00 and, therefore, is within the jurisdiction of the Superior Court.

14. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. (1) [(X] compensatory damages (2) [ punitive damages The amount of damages is (in cases for personal injury or wrongful death, you must check (1)): (1) [X] according to proof (2) (] inthe amountof: $

15. The paragraphs of this complaint alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) \ {SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENCHER, DAVID L.