This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 06:13:52 (UTC).

JEFFREY DEMARTINI vs. ABUL BASAR, et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 JEFFREY DEMARTINI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABUL BASAR,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5326

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMARTINI, JEFFREY

Defendants

BASAR, ABUL

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMANUEL, TODD P.

Defendant Attorney

HOME, W. STUART, III

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADR PACKAGE; Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADR PACKAGE; PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE served to HELENA BASAR WIFE

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Demand For Jury Trial.

Demand For Jury Trial AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES Comment AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for BASAR, ABUL; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-007737-HOJ BASAR, ABUL $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for BASAR, ABUL; Transaction Assessment $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; BASAR, ABUL; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAdvance Jury Fee Defendant Paid Thru E-filing.; Additional Info: Comment Non Refundable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees.; Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEMARTINI, JEFFREY; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-045727-HOJ DEMARTINI, JEFFREY $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEMARTINI, JEFFREY; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; DEMARTINI, JEFFREY; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less