This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 16:57:47 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL VS IMELDA NAVA

Case Summary

On 01/07/2013 JEFFERSON CAPITAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IMELDA NAVA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8923

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendants

IMELDA NAVA

NAVA, IMELDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

2180 Harvard St., Ste 160 P.O. Box 13807

Sacramento, CA 95853

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

WRIT (30) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (9) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $37.75, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 06/02/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL INSTRUMENT; INTEREST & CCP1033 FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC AS TO IMELDA NAVA.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC AS TO IMELDA NAVA BY SUB-SERVING EZEQUIEL DOE, CO-OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 01/25/13.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC; Awarded Against: NAVA IMELDA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 06/02/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC FOR JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC AGAINST IMELDA NAVA PRINCIPAL IS $4,430.59. INTEREST IS $799.81. COSTS ARE $299.50. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,529.90.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (30) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140923-0221-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $5592.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS (9) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $37.75, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140807-0051-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $5529.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2013
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment *XFR: --> CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/519923 TO CLJ/518923.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130107-0668-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Financial info for JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201301070668 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Financial info for JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Financial: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

0/00/2012 13:17:27 FAX 2132499977 NATIONWIDE LEGAL F & S 662

PLD-C-001

Robert Scott Kennard S.B.N. 117017 FOR COURT USE ONLY NELSON & KENNARD File No. 12-07282-0

2180 Harvard Street, Ste. 160 (95815)

P.O. Box 13807

Sacramento, CA 95853

TELEPHONENO: (916) 920-2295 FAX NO .(Optional)- E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optiona): ATTORNEYFOR (Name): JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS,

SAN MATEO COUNTY

DEFENDANT: IMELDA NAVA ,

[ XJDOES 1 TO 10 CONTRACT

[X] COMPLAINT [ ] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number): [ ]CROSS-COMPLAINT [ ) AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number):

Jurisdiction (check all thatapply):

[ X]ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [ X] does not exceed $10,000 [ ]exceeds $10,000 but does notexceed $25,000 JACTIONIS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) ] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint [ ]from limited to unlimited [ ] from uniimited to limited

1. Plaintff* (name or names): JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC alleges causes of action against defendant*(name or names): IMELDA NAVA 2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 4

3. a Each plaintiff named abowe is a competent aduit [ X ] except plaintiff (name). JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LIC a corporation qualified to do business in California an unincorporated entity (describe): [ X] other (specify). A CORPORATION OR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY b. [ ] Plaintiff (name): a. has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify}: b. has camplied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify): c.[ ] Information about additional plaintifts who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c.

4. a Each defendant named abowe is a natural person

4. a Each defendant named abowe is a natural person 0/00/2012 13:17:27 FAX 2132499977 NATIONWIDE LEGAL F & S 663

0/00/2012 13:17:27 FAX 2132499977 NATIONWIDE LEGAL F & S 663

PLD-C-001

SHORT TITLE CASE NUMBER: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC v. IMELDA NAVA, et al.

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [ X] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1 - 5 were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment. (2) [ X] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 6_—_10 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff. c. [ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d [ ] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names}).

5. [ ]Plaintiff is required to comply with aclaims statute, and a.[ ] plaintiff has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [ ] plaintiff is excused from complying because (specify):

6. [ ] This actionis subjectto [ ] Civil Code section 181210 [ ] Civil Code section 2984.4.

7. This court is the proper court because a.[ ]a defendant entered into the contract here. b.[ ]a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into. c.[ X] a defendant lives here now. d.[ ]thecontract was to be performed here. e.[ ]adefendantis a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. f [ ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here. g.[ ]other (speciy). 8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): [ ]Breach of Contract

[ X] Common Counts [ ] Other (specify):

9. [ X ]Other allegations: For good and valuable consideration, the account which is the subject of this action was purchased by Plaintiff, who is now the lawful owner and holder thereof.

Prior to commencement of this action, the Defendant’s were informed in writing that if an action were commenced, the Plaintiff may recover its court costs, where allowed by law, in addition to principal and interest otherwise owed.

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. [ X]damagesof$ 4,430.59 b. [ X]interest on the damages

(1) [ ]according to proof

(2) [X] at the rate of (specify): _10.000 percent per year from (date): 06/10/11 c. [ ] attomey fees

(M1 Jof$

(2) [ ]according to proof.

d. [ ] cther (specify) 11.[ ] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

Date: September 12, 2012

ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD

(Signature of plaintiff or

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)