This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 02:57:50 (UTC).

Jason Veloro, et al vs. FCA US, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Jason Veloro filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6401

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Veloro, Jason

Veloro, Starlite

Defendants

FCA US, LLC

PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC.

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN, TIONNA

Defendant Attorney

UNIVERSAL, JON D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FCA US, LLC : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-000455-HOJ FCA US, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FCA US, LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FCA US, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Veloro, Jason : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-049527-HOJ Veloro, Jason $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Veloro, Jason : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Veloro, Jason; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Universal, Jon David