This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 08:15:26 (UTC).

JASINTA KHORGE VS BRADLEY C SOLIS

Case Summary

On 11/01/2011 JASINTA KHORGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRADLEY C SOLIS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L and STEVEN L. DYLINA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9448

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

STEVEN L. DYLINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHORGE, JASINTA

Defendant

SOLIS, BRADLEY C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLT, DOUG

Defendant Attorney

SCHAAR, DAN C

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 10/09/12.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE Comment NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF KHORGE SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/01/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL (2) Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WIHT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF KHORGE FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS REPRESENTED BY DAN C SCHAAR

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WIHT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WIHT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS FILED. DATE OF Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 10/09/12.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JASINTA KHORGE. Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JASINTA KHORGE.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, FILED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS. Comment NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS.

Conversion Action.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS Comment DFJ: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS

Answer (Unlimited).

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF KHORGE FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS REPRESENTED BY DAN C SCHAAR Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF KHORGE FILED BY BRADLEY C SOLIS, REPRESENTED BY DAN C SCHAAR

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF KHORGE SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS WITH SERVI Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF KHORGE SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/01/12.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WIHT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WIHT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS FILED. DATE OF Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON BRADLEY C SOLIS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 10/09/12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JASINTA KHORGE. Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JASINTA KHORGE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; SOLIS, BRADLEY C; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; KHORGE, JASINTA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JASINTA KHORGE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • FinancialFinancial info for KHORGE, JASINTA; Case Payment Receipt # 201111030686 KHORGE, JASINTA $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • FinancialFinancial info for KHORGE, JASINTA; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • FinancialFinancial; KHORGE, JASINTA; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 11/01/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 111103-0686-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less