This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 09:00:39 (UTC).

JANE DOE vs. CITY OF SAN MATEO, et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SAN MATEO,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mau, Michael L, FOILES and Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2023

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mau, Michael L

FOILES

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE, JANE

Defendants

City of San Mateo

City of San Mateo Police Department

City of San Mateo Communications

Barberini, Edward

VALENICA, SCOTT

DOES 1 THROUGH 250, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANNY, PAULA K.

Defendant Attorney

EMMANEEL, JENNIFER A.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY BY CLERK ANTHONY BERINI Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Comment COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY BY CLERK ANTHONY BERINI

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF NAMED DEFENDANTS CITY OF SAN MATEO POL Comment Type: FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF NAMED DEFENDANTS, CITY OF SAN MATEO POLICE DEPARTMENT AND CITY OF SAN MATEO COMMUNICATIONS Signed by: JUDGE FOILES Date Signed: 9/20/2022 COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF PAULA CANNY ON 9/21/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of SERVED ATTORNEY - PROOF OF SERVICE FOR SERVICE OF ORDER TO CONTINUE Comment SERVED ATTORNEY - PROOF OF SERVICE FOR SERVICE OF ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS THE ACTION IS NOT YET "AT ISSUE" AND AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNME Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FORM, ADR PACKET

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNME Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE PF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FORM, ADR STIPULATION AND EVALUATION INSTRUCTIONS, BLANK STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION, APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION INFORMATION SHEET

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of THE SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSI Comment THE SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FORM, ADR STIPULATION AND EVALUATION INSTRUCTIONS, BLANK STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION, APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION INFORMATION SHEET

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY BY CLERK ANTHONY BERINI Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Comment COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY BY CLERK ANTHONY BERINI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • Docket1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 06/07/23 per D's counsel request by LC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOSC Needs to be set Failure to file Stip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.; Additional Info: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of THE SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSI Comment THE SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FORM, ADR STIPULATION AND EVALUATION INSTRUCTIONS, BLANK STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION, APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DOE, JANE; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-019248-HOJ DOE, JANE $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DOE, JANE; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; DOE, JANE; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less