This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 02/09/2020 at 01:16:20 (UTC).

JAMES J. ISON vs. CHOLAKIAN & ASSOCIATES PC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 JAMES J ISON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHOLAKIAN ASSOCIATES PC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1869

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISON, JAMES J.

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

CHOLAKIAN & ASSOCIATES PC

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K

FINN, BRIAN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ISON, JAMES J.

Defendant Attorneys

FINN, BRIAN J

PARKER, ALDEN J.

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice as to ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice as to ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 08/01/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: GREGOR A HENSRUDE KLINEDINST P.C. New Attorney: ALD Comment Former Attorney: GREGOR A HENSRUDE, KLINEDINST P.C. New Attorney: ALDEN J PARKER

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: GREGOR A HENSRUDE KLINEDINST P.C. New Attorney: ALD Comment Former Attorney: GREGOR A HENSRUDE, KLINEDINST P.C. New Attorney: ALDEN J PARKER

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 1 as BRIAN J. FINN Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 1 as BRIAN J. FINN

Association of Counsel / Attorney.

Association of Counsel / Attorney Attorney: CHOLAKIAN AND ASSOCIATES hereby associates with Attorney Comment Attorney: CHOLAKIAN AND ASSOCIATES hereby associates with Attorney: GREGOR A HENSRUDE

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: ISON JAMES J.; CHOLAKIAN & ASSOCIATES PC; CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K; DOES 1 TO 20; FINN, BRIAN J; Finn, Brian J; Comment: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice as to ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice as to ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ISON, JAMES J. : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-047723-HOJ ISON; JAMES; J. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ISON, JAMES J. : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees. Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ISON, JAMES J. : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-020582-HOJ ISON, JAMES J. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ISON, JAMES J. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: ISON, JAMES J.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cholakian & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER ALDEN J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINN BRIAN J.