This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 20:36:39 (UTC).

JAMES HAGGARTY, ET AL VS. CHARLES HAGGARTY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2015 JAMES HAGGARTY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLES HAGGARTY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Karesh, Jonathan E, Etezadi, Susan I, DuBois, Richard H, Karesh, Jonathan E., DuBois, Richard H. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6725

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Karesh, Jonathan E

Etezadi, Susan I

DuBois, Richard H

Karesh, Jonathan E.

DuBois, Richard H.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CECELIA HAGGARTY=D'ANTONIO

JAMES HAGGARTY

MARY E. HAGGARTY-ROBERTS

KATHLEEN M. HAGGARTY-MUZIO

HAGGARTY-D'ANTONIO, CECELIA

HAGGARTY, JAMES

HAGGARTY-ROBERTS, MARY E.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NORM DRESS

JOSEPH HAGGARTY JR

CLAIRE HAGGARTY

GINA HAGGARTY

NBT REALTY SERVICES,INC.

THE HAGGARTY CORPORATION

S AND H SEVEN LLC

WDJ&CO, CPAS

CHARLES HAGGARTY

HAGGARTY, JOSEPH, SR

DRESS, NORM

HAGGARTY, CLAIRE

HAGGARTY, GINA

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTIAN, JOHN P

CORREIA, SHAUNA N

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TRAVER, WALTER J.R.

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY H

WOOD, GREGORY J

WOOD, GREGORY J.

Other Attorneys

DOWLING, DONALD J.

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY Comment TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Order.

Order SIGNED BY JUDGE DUBOIS ON 01/13/17 - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE Comment SIGNED BY JUDGE DUBOIS ON 01/13/17 - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON NORM DRESS AND WDJ & CO. CPA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY Comment TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of PROPOSED ORD RE APPLICATION TO SEAL; NTC OF WITHDRAWAL; NTC Comment PROPOSED ORD RE APPLICATION TO SEAL; NTC OF WITHDRAWAL; NTC OF MOT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL EXHIBITS ETC Comment (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL EXHIBITS, ETC

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/16 FILED. Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/16 FILED.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JAMES HAGGARTY KATHLEEN M. HAGGARTY-MUZIO, MARY E. HAGGARTY-ROB Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JAMES HAGGARTY, KATHLEEN M. HAGGARTY-MUZIO, MARY E. HAGGARTY-ROBERTS, CECELIA HAGGARTY=D'ANTONIO.

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minutes Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: CORREIA, SHAUNA NPlaintiffAttorney: CORREIA, SHAUNA NPlaintiffAttorney: CORREIA, SHAUNA NPlaintiffAttorney: CORREIA, SHAUNA NDefendantAttorney: DOWLING, DONALD J.

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 5/16/17 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 5/16/17

Notice.

Notice OF WITHFRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION Comment OF WITHFRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE Comment OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY FILED BY JOSEPH HAGGARTY JR REPRESENTED BY DONALD J. DOWLING Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY FILED BY JOSEPH HAGGARTY JR , REPRESENTED BY DONALD J. DOWLING

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY AS TO CHARLES HAGGARTY FI Comment NAR: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY AS TO CHARLES HAGGARTY FILED. SIGNED BY: WALTER TRAVER. DATE SIGNED: 04/22/16

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY SERVED ON JOSEPH HAGGARTY JR WITH Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY SERVED ON JOSEPH HAGGARTY JR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/10/16.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY AS TO NORM DRESS BY SUB-SERVIN Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF HAGGARTY AS TO NORM DRESS, BY SUB-SERVING CONNIE BUTLER - RECEPTIONIST. MAILING DATE OF 02/09/16.

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CASE DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 3-22-17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (CONDITIONAL).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: WDJ&CO DRESS NORM; Comment: PARTIES DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 2-6-17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: HAGGARTY CLAIRE, SR; HAGGARTY, JOSEPH, SR; Comment: PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 081216.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment 7 DAY ESTIMATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues. Additional Info: Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • Financial info for HAGGARTY, JAMES : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Financial: HAGGARTY, JAMES; Total Financial Assessment $1,065.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,065.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201605240286 Payor $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201605240284 Payor $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201604060570 Payor $2175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201602160539 Payor $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Financial: Payor; Total Financial Assessment $4,035.00; Total Payments and Credits $4,035.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.