This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 21:54:30 (UTC).

ISRAEL ESTUARDO ZAMBRANO vs. GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 ISRAEL ESTUARDO ZAMBRANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, RICHARD B. ULMER, Mau, Michael L and FENG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4372

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

RICHARD B. ULMER

Mau, Michael L

FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMBRANO, ISRAEL ESTUARDO

Defendants

GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50

Cross Plaintiff

GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC

Cross Defendants

JUYNH, HUY NGOC

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERCY, WILLIAM

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BRAASCH, DEBRA L

 

Court Documents

Motion to Transfer/Change Venue.

Motion to Transfer/Change Venue DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE; MEMORANDUM Comment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND DECLARATION OF BRIAN HEDSTROM; DECLARATION OF JACOB A. GELEGAN.

Notice of Completion of Transfer of Action.

Notice of Completion of Transfer of Action Sent to County SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY Originating County C Comment Sent to County SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY Originating County Case #: CGC-21-593748

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice.

Notice TO PLAINTIFF Comment TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Proposed Order (no fee).

Stipulation and Proposed Order (no fee) TO CHANGE VENUES TO SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment TO CHANGE VENUES TO SAN MATEO COUNTY

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT, ORDER GR Comment ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT, ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF TRANSFER ACTION, ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, SERVED TO MIKE HUYNH, CO-RESIDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Case Payment Receipt # 2022-038318-HOJ SPECIALIZED LEGAL SERVICES, INC $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint.; Additional Info: Cross Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Proposed Order (no fee).; Additional Info: Stipulation and Proposed Order (no fee) TO CHANGE VENUES TO SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment TO CHANGE VENUES TO SAN MATEO COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand For Jury Trial.; Additional Info: Demand For Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice TO PLAINTIFF Comment TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less