This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:55:04 (UTC).

ISAO MATSUURA AND KATHRYN MATSUURA

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 ISAO MATSUURA AND KATHRYN MATSUURA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Franchi, Don R and Franchi, Don R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8625

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Franchi, Don R

Franchi, Don R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATSUURA, ISAO

Respondent

MATSUURA, KATHRYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOLTZ, STEVEN

Respondent Attorney

MIYAUCHI, EDWARD S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: MATSUURA KATHRYN; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: MATSUURA, ISAO; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Document. Additional Info: Comment IMGDOC: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME AFTER JUDGMENT; KATHRYN MATSUURA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Stipulation sent for signature to Department. Additional Info: Comment SFS: STIPULATION SENT TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Order received. Additional Info: Comment OR1: ORDER RECEIVED FROM KATHRYN MATSUURA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 12/09/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 12/09/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal. Additional Info: Comment DDUD: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ASW1: APPEARANCE STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONSE ALREADY FILED) FILED BY ISAO MATSUURA, KATHRYN MATSUURA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Stipulation & Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure. Additional Info: Comment SWFDD: STIPULATION & WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2012
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, KATHRYN : Case Payment Receipt # 201209210657 MATSUURA, KATHRYN $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, KATHRYN : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Financial: MATSUURA, KATHRYN; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, ISAO : Case Payment Receipt # 201305030915 MATSUURA, ISAO $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, ISAO : Case Payment Receipt # 201305030913 MATSUURA, ISAO $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, ISAO : Case Payment Receipt # 201305030912 MATSUURA, ISAO $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, ISAO : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, ISAO : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060449 MATSUURA, ISAO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for MATSUURA, ISAO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: MATSUURA, ISAO; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less