This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 21:29:22 (UTC).

ISAAC CASTANEDA ESTRADA vs. GANNA VARLAMOVA, et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 ISAAC CASTANEDA ESTRADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GANNA VARLAMOVA,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0536

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA, ISAAC CASTANEDA

Defendants

VARLAMOVA, GANNA

LYMYCH, SERGIL

DOES 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, JORDAN D.

Defendant Attorney

WALSH, CATHERINE A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY JORDAN JOHNSON ON 06/17/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Comment COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY JORDAN JOHNSON ON 06/17/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PAC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PAC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; ESTRADA, ISAAC CASTANEDA; VARLAMOVA, GANNA; LYMYCH, SERGIL; DOES 1 through 20, inclusive; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 10/30/22- courtesy ext as case was on OSC list and med is set for 09/29/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY JORDAN JOHNSON ON 06/17/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Comment COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY JORDAN JOHNSON ON 06/17/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PAC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESTRADA, ISAAC CASTANEDA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-005581-HOJ Estrada, Isaac Castaneda $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESTRADA, ISAAC CASTANEDA; Transaction Assessment $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; ESTRADA, ISAAC CASTANEDA; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH, CATHERINE A.