This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 06:53:29 (UTC).

IRIS HECKER VS WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2011 IRIS HECKER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F S B. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Buchwald, Gerald J, Swope, V Raymond, Foiles, Robert D, Bergeron, Joseph E, Novak, Lisa A, Miram, George A, Dylina, Steven L, Scott, Joseph C, Buchwald, Gerald J., Swope, V. Raymond, Dylina, Steven L., Novak, Lisa A., Miram, George A. and Scott, Joseph C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2062

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Buchwald, Gerald J

Swope, V Raymond

Foiles, Robert D

Bergeron, Joseph E

Novak, Lisa A

Miram, George A

Dylina, Steven L

Scott, Joseph C

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Swope, V. Raymond

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

Miram, George A.

Scott, Joseph C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HECKER, IRIS

Defendants

NDEX WEST, LLC

BRASUELL, CLAY ALAN

WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. a Division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

WACHOVIA MORTGAGE,A DIVISION OF WELLS FARGO

WACHOVIA MORTGAGE , F.S.B.

BRASUELL, MARY GRACE

GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE CO

FOREST BAY FINANCIAL

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

LSI TITLE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOSS, LINDA Z

Defendant Attorneys

TREDER, EDWARD A

ANGLIN, FLEWELLING, RASMUSSEN CAMPBELL &

RAPKINE, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (4) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE CO.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (9) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NDEX WEST LLC.

Motion.

NOTICE (9) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF THE PLEADINGS; M.P.A. IN SUPPORT FILED BY NDEX WEST LLC, LSI TITLE COMPANY

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (11) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARY GRACE BRASUELL.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Request.

REQUEST Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEF.'S MOTION FOR JDGMNT. ON THE PLDGS. DECL. OF M. RAPKINE.

Conversion Action.

ORDER Comment OWA: ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD ON COMPLAINT OF HECKER FILED; JOHN S SARGETIS REMOVED AS TO IRIS HECKER AND REPLACED WITH PRO/PER SIGNED BY JUDGE BERGERON, ON 01/28/13.

Motion.

NOTICE (7) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE CO, WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B.

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dispositioned; Party; Name: BRASUELL MARY GRACE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BRASUELL, CLAY ALAN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: FOREST BAY FINANCIAL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. a Division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Conversion Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE CO; WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; NDEX WEST, LLC; LSI TITLE COMPANY; Awarded Against: HECKER, IRIS; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/24/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF HECKER FOR GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE CO , WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NDEX WEST, LLC, LSI TITLE COMPANY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF HECKER AGAINST IRIS HECKER DEFENDANT(S) GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE CO, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NDEX WEST, LLC, LSI TITLE COMPANY DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM PRINCIPAL IS $0.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $0.00 THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS WACHOVIA, GOLDEN WEST, NDEX AND LSI. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS WACHOVIA, GOLDEN WET, NDEX AND LSI, AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF IRIS HECKER AS TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION IN THE COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF IRIS HECKER WILL TAKE AND RECOVER NOTHING IN THIS ACTION FROM DEFENDANTS WACHOVIA, GOLDEN WEST, NDEX AND LSI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 11/27/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY S KANE ON 05/09/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (DUE TO PLTF'S BANKRUPTCY FILING) FILED 11/27/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HT: HEARING TRANSFERRED TO 05/01/14 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT PJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
637 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2011
  • Financial: GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE CO; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Financial info for WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. a Division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 201205020306 WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. a Division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Financial info for WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. a Division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Financial: WORLD SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. a Division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $20.00; Total Payments and Credits $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • Financial info for HECKER, IRIS : Case Payment Receipt # 201211270727 HECKER, IRIS $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • Financial info for HECKER, IRIS : Case Payment Receipt # 201108040665 HECKER, IRIS $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • Financial info for HECKER, IRIS : Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Financial info for HECKER, IRIS : Case Payment Receipt # 201101060357 HECKER, IRIS $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Financial info for HECKER, IRIS : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Financial: HECKER, IRIS; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN WEST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION SERVICE C is a litigant

Latest cases where LSI TITLE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where NDEX WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WACHOVIA MORTGAGE F.S.B. is a litigant