This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:18:46 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS VS RICARDO CONCEPCION ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RICARDO CONCEPCION ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Novak, Lisa A, Lee, Elizabeth K, Lee, Elizabeth K., Dylina, Steven L. and Novak, Lisa A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4886

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Novak, Lisa A

Lee, Elizabeth K

Lee, Elizabeth K.

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Defendants

RICARDO CONCEPCION

CONCEPCION, RIC

CONCEPCION, RICK

CONCEPCION, RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FLETTERICK, JEFFREY

CARVO, DANIEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Motion.

NOTICE (4) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER RE JUDGMENT DEBTOR SPOUSE FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF JEFFREY FLETTERICK WAIVING EXCESS ATTY FEES PRAYED FOR IN THE COMPLAINT

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPP OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT (CCP 585/CCP 1033)

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (2) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,813.37, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $53.00 ---

Notice.

NOTICE (3) Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC.

Substitution of Attorney as to.

ATTORNEY (2) Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY LORA GREVIOUS REMOVED AS TO INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY DANIEL JOHN CARVO.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC.

Conversion Action.

ORDER Comment DOCALO: DECLARATION AND ORDER THAT COPY BE ACCEPTED IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC AS TO RICARDO CONCEPCION.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Substitution of Attorney as to.

ATTORNEY Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY JEFFREY FLETTERICK REMOVED AS TO INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY LORA GREVIOUS.

Judgment by Court.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCT: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 11/20/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC.

Notice.

NOTICE (2) Comment N2: NOTICE OF HEARING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC.

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N2: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CONTINUED CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC; Awarded Against: CONCEPCION RICARDO; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 11/20/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC FOR INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC AGAINST RICARDO CONCEPCION PRINCIPAL IS $55,894.00. INTEREST IS $20,552.30. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $2,273.41. COSTS ARE $455.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $79,174.71.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: ATTORNEY (2) Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY LORA GREVIOUS REMOVED AS TO INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY DANIEL JOHN CARVO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: LETTER RECEIVED FROM ATTY FOR PLTF RE TAKING HEARING OFF CALENDAR..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment HEARING: MOTION RE: FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER AGAINST EARNINGS OF DEBTOR'S SPOUSE BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Motion hearings. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: LM HEARING: MOTION RE: FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER AGAINST EARNINGS OF DEBTOR'S SPOUSE BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: LETTER RECEIVED FROM ATTY FOR PLTF RE: TAKING 10/02/14 HEARING OFF CALENDAR..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY SC ON 09/03/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/02/14 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT LM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AAP: ATTORNEY STEVEN SCHAIMAN APPEARING WITH/FOR PLAINTIFF(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0541-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Financial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201407310097 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Financial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Financial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201407210836 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Financial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260541 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC; Total Financial Assessment $485.00; Total Payments and Credits $485.00

    Read MoreRead Less