This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/28/2018 at 03:18:40 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF MARC MORGOVSKY

Case Summary

On 03/10/2005 IN THE MATTER OF MARC MORGOVSKY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A and Miram, George A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5429

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A

Miram, George A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORGOVSKY, MARC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2005
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Completed; Party; Name: MORGOVSKY MARC; Comment: 0001 PETITION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment NEW: NEW NAME OF MARC VAYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment FDCN: FINAL DISPOSITION OF PETITION OF MORGOVSKY CHANGING THE NAME OF MARC MORGOVSKY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DCN: DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY TPETRIAT ON 05/11/05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: DECREE SIGNED THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT MARC MORGOVSKY SHALL BE KNOWN HEREAFTER AS MARC VAYN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PGRA: PETITION GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THERE BEING NO OBJECTION TO THE PETITION ORALLY OR IN WRITING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THE COURT FINDS NOTICE REQURIED BY LAW HAS BEEN GIVEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: NO OTHER APPEARANCE WAS MADE ON THIS MATTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYPP: MARC MORGOVSKY PRESENT IN PRO PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Miram George A. Comment JCR: HONORABLE GEORGE A. MIRAM, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: TERRI PETRIAT. COURT REPORTER: LORNA TRAUBE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Miram George A. Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing. Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Hearing Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: PJ ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • Proof of Publication of. Additional Info: Comment PRFPUB: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION OF THE FOSTER CITY ISLANDER FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2005
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment OSCCN: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHANGE OF NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition File Date 03/10/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • Petition. Additional Info: Comment PCN: PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.