This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 10:09:34 (UTC).

IN RE THE MATTER OF THE DAVID AND PATRIA NICOLAS FAMILY TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 22, 2001

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 IN RE THE MATTER OF THE DAVID AND PATRIA NICOLAS FAMILY TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 22, 2001 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1519

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nicolas, John

Respondent

Schaukowitch, Renee

Decedents

NICOLAS, PATRIA

NICHOLAS, DAVID J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'LEARY, MATTHEW

Respondent Attorney

CANNY, PAULA K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re.

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach Comment Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach of Trust etc. served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 04/01/2021

Petition Hearing.

Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 04/23/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT Parties Present Petitioner: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEWRespondentAttorney: STROH, HERBERT A.

Summons Issued.

Summons Issued

Objection/Opposition to.

Objection/Opposition Comment TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNTING

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action.

45098Requestf0073955 Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

Petition Hearing.

Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/17/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT Parties Present Petitioner: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEWRespondentAttorney: STROH, HERBERT A.

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re.

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach Comment Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach of Trust etc. served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 11/30/2020

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TURSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMANGES FOR F Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TURSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMANGES FOR FINANCIAL ELER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action.

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed and entered Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to

Petition Hearing.

Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 04/23/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT Parties Present Petitioner: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re.

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach Comment Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach of Trust etc. served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 04/01/2021

Petition Hearing.

Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/17/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT Parties Present Petitioner: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

Objection/Opposition to.

Objection/Opposition to TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES Comment TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNTING

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re.

Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach Comment Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach of Trust etc. served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 11/30/2020

Summons Issued.

Summons Issued

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TURSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMANGES FOR F Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TURSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMANGES FOR FINANCIAL ELER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPetition Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Other Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed and entered Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.; Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 04/23/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT Parties Present Petitioner: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach Comment Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach of Trust etc. served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 04/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Schaukowitch, Renee; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-006397-HOJ Schaukowitch, Renee $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Schaukowitch, Renee; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Schaukowitch, Renee; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/17/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT Parties Present Petitioner: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection/Opposition to.; Additional Info: Objection/Opposition to TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES Comment TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach Comment Petition for Order to Surcharge Trustee for Breach of Trust etc. served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 11/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued.; Additional Info: Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Nicolas, John; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-045294-HOJ Nicolas, John $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Nicolas, John; Transaction Assessment $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Nicolas, John; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TURSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMANGES FOR F Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TURSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMANGES FOR FINANCIAL ELER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL.; Additional Info: Petition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BR Comment PETITION FOR ORDER TO SURCHARGE TRUSTEE FOR BREACH OF TRUST; FOR DAMAGES FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; AND COMPELLING ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less