This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 15:16:43 (UTC).

IN RE: HONGXIAO ZHOU

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 IN RE HONGXIAO ZHOU was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KARESH, Karesh, Jonathan E. and Karesh, Jonathan E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3960

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

KARESH

Judges

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Karesh, Jonathan E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ZHOU, HONGXIAO

ZHOU, SARAH HONGXIAO

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name.

Decree Changing Name Signed By: JUDGE KARESHDate Signed: 11/20/2020New Name: SARAH HONGXIAO ZHOU Comment Signed By: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 11/20/2020 New Name: SARAH HONGXIAO ZHOU

Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 11/20/2020 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: ZHOU, HONGXIAO

Certificate of Publication re: Name Change.

Certificate of Publication re: Name Change LAST DATE OF PUBLICATION 10/21/20/ EXAMINER-MILLBRAE SUN Comment LAST DATE OF PUBLICATION 10/21/20/ EXAMINER-MILLBRAE SUN

Notice of Change of Name Hearing.

Notice of Change of Name Hearing

Order to Show Cause Change of Name.

Order to Show Cause Change of Name SIGNED BY JUDGE KARESH ON 9/18/20 Comment SIGNED BY JUDGE KARESH ON 9/18/20

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received OSC NAME CHANGE SENT TO DEPT 20 Comment OSC NAME CHANGE SENT TO DEPT 20

Proposed Decree Received.

Proposed Decree Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Name Change.

Petition for Name Change

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Court Finding; Party; Name: ZHOU HONGXIAO; Comment: NEW NAME: SARAH HONGXIAO ZHOU 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing Name. Additional Info: Decree Changing Name Signed By: JUDGE KARESHDate Signed: 11/20/2020New Name: SARAH HONGXIAO ZHOU Comment Signed By: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 11/20/2020 New Name: SARAH HONGXIAO ZHOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and or/ video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Change of Name. Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 11/20/2020 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: ZHOU, HONGXIAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Publication re: Name Change. Additional Info: Certificate of Publication re: Name Change LAST DATE OF PUBLICATION 10/21/20/ EXAMINER-MILLBRAE SUN Comment LAST DATE OF PUBLICATION 10/21/20/ EXAMINER-MILLBRAE SUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Name Hearing. Additional Info: Notice of Change of Name Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Change of Name. Additional Info: Order to Show Cause Change of Name SIGNED BY JUDGE KARESH ON 9/18/20 Comment SIGNED BY JUDGE KARESH ON 9/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition for Name Change File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received OSC NAME CHANGE SENT TO DEPT 20 Comment OSC NAME CHANGE SENT TO DEPT 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Decree Received. Additional Info: Proposed Decree Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Name Change. Additional Info: Petition for Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less