This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:59:09 (UTC).

IN RE DAVID LEE CECCARELLI

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 IN RE DAVID LEE CECCARELLI was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5888

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LEE, DAVID CECCARELLI

CECCARELLI, DAVID LEE

 

Court Documents

Petition.

PETITION Comment PCN: PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Conversion Action.

OSC Comment OSCCN: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHANGE OF NAME FILED

Conversion Action.

ORDER Comment DCN: DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED

Certificate of Publication re: Name Change.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment CPRNC: CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION RE: NAME CHANGE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Completed; Party; Name: LEE DAVID CECCARELLI; Comment: 0001 PETITION; Party; Name: CECCARELLI, DAVID LEE; Comment: 0001 PETITION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120926-0106-CC 141/ 50.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: ORDER Comment DCN: DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment NEW: NEW NAME OF DAVID CECCARELLI LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment FDCN: FINAL DISPOSITION OF PETITION OF CECCARELLI CHANGING THE NAME OF DAVID LEE CECCARELLI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY JENNIFER ARNOTT ON 09/26/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FOS: FORMAL ORDER SUBMITTED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: PETITIONER'S NEW NAME IS DAVID CECCARELLI LEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PGRA: PETITION GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Publication re: Name Change. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment CPRNC: CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION RE: NAME CHANGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: OSC Comment OSCCN: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHANGE OF NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0660-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition. Additional Info: PETITION Comment PCN: PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for CECCARELLI, DAVID LEE : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060660 CECCARELLI, DAVID LEE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for CECCARELLI, DAVID LEE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: CECCARELLI, DAVID LEE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less