This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 09:48:32 (UTC).

IN RE DAVID AND PATRIA NICOLAS FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 22, 2001

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 IN RE DAVID AND PATRIA NICOLAS FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 22, 2001 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A and Grandsaert, John L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1491

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A

Grandsaert, John L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Schaukowitch, Renee

Not Classified By Court and Respondent

Nicolas, John

Decedent

NICHOLAS, DAVID J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CANNY, PAULA K.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

O'LEARY, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to

Document filed:.

Document filed: COURTCALL APPEARANCE - SERVICE COPY Comment COURTCALL APPEARANCE - SERVICE COPY

Supplement.

Supplement FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION Comment FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE'S AND ATTORNEYS' FEES

Petition Hearing.

Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/05/2021 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE'S FEES AND ATTORNEY'S FEES Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: STROH, HERBERT A.Objector: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action.

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed and entered Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

Status Conference.

Original Type Status Conference ~PRO Minute Order - Status Conference 04/23/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: STROH, HERBERT A.Objector: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

Objection/Opposition to.

Objection/Opposition to (RESPONSE AND) TO THE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTE Comment (RESPONSE AND) TO THE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE'S AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

Supplemental.

Supplemental SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNTING FOR NONTRUST ASSETS Comment SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNTING FOR NONTRUST ASSETS

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action.

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed and entered Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action.

Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed and entered Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to

Status Conference.

Original Type Status Conference ~PRO Minute Order - Status Conference 04/23/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Objector: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

Supplemental.

Supplemental SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNTING FOR NONTRUST ASSETS Comment SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNTING FOR NONTRUST ASSETS

Petition Hearing.

Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/17/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Related case 20PRO01519. Approval of Trustee & Attorney fees. Parties Present Objector: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

Supplement.

Supplement FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION Comment FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE'S AND ATTORNEYS' FEES

Petition Hearing.

Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/05/2021 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE'S FEES AND ATTORNEY'S FEES Parties Present Objector: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed and entered Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed and entered Comment With Prejudice filed and entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.; Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Status Conference ~PRO Minute Order - Status Conference 04/23/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Objector: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental.; Additional Info: Supplemental SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNTING FOR NONTRUST ASSETS Comment SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNTING FOR NONTRUST ASSETS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Petition Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/17/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Related case 20PRO01519. Approval of Trustee & Attorney fees. Parties Present Objector: Nicolas, JohnAttorney: O'LEARY, MATTHEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection/Opposition to.; Additional Info: Objection/Opposition to (RESPONSE AND) TO THE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTE Comment (RESPONSE AND) TO THE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE'S AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument filed:.; Additional Info: Document filed: COURTCALL APPEARANCE - SERVICE COPY Comment COURTCALL APPEARANCE - SERVICE COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential declaration.; Additional Info: Comment Declaration re Confidential Financial Statements

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTAND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRU Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTAND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 12/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Schaukowitch, Renee; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-044577-HOJ Schaukowitch, Renee $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Schaukowitch, Renee; Transaction Assessment $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Schaukowitch, Renee; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSORT TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS S Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSORT TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE'S FEES AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL.; Additional Info: Petition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSO Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL FOR TRUSTEE'S AND ATTORNEYS' FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less