This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:58:12 (UTC).

IN RE CIVIL DETENTION OF FILIBERTO GUITERREZ ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 IN RE CIVIL DETENTION OF FILIBERTO GUITERREZ ETAL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5895

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY COUNSEL

Petitioners

GUITERREZ, FILIBERTO

ESTRADA, LIBRADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ARCHER, REBECCA M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONT CIVIL SERVED ON FILIBERTO GUITERREZ BY U Comment POS: PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONT CIVIL SERVED ON FILIBERTO GUITERREZ BY US MAIL WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/07/12.

Document.

DECLARATION OF DR. SCOTT MORROW IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE CIVIL DET Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF DR. SCOTT MORROW IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE CIVIL DET FILED.

Request.

REQUEST FOR HEARING FILED BY FILIBERTO GUITERREZ. Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR HEARING FILED BY FILIBERTO GUITERREZ.

Order.

ORDER TO CONT DETENTION SIGNED BY JUDGE FOILES ON 08/06/12, FILED. Comment O: ORDER TO CONT DETENTION, SIGNED BY JUDGE FOILES ON 08/06/12, FILED.

Document.

DEC OF REBECCA M ARCHER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APP L FOR ORDER TO CONT CIVIL DETENTION FILED. Comment FILED: DEC OF REBECCA M ARCHER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APP L FOR ORDER TO CONT CIVIL DETENTION, FILED.

Document.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORD FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL SRVD ON SAN MATEO CO COUNSEL ON 8/9/12 FILED. Comment FILED: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORD FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL SRVD ON SAN MATEO CO COUNSEL ON 8/9/12, FILED.

Order.

ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IN RE: CIVIL DETENTION UNDER HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTS SIGNED BY Comment O2: ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IN RE: CIVIL DETENTION UNDER HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTS, SIGNED BY RF ON 08/06/12 FILED.

Document.

STIP & ORDER (RE-HEALTH OFFICER ORDER FOR DEFT PURS TO HEALTH & SAFEY CODE 10290 121365, 121366, F Comment FILED: STIP & ORDER (RE-HEALTH OFFICER ORDER FOR DEFT PURS TO HEALTH & SAFEY CODE 10290, 121365, 121366, FILED.

Document.

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S EXPARTE APP FOR ORDER TO CON T CIVIL DETENTION PURSUANT TO H&S CODE 12135212 Comment FILED: COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S EXPARTE APP FOR ORDER TO CON T CIVIL DETENTION PURSUANT TO H&S CODE 121352,121, FILED.

Conversion Action.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR ORDER T O CONT CIVIL DETENTION PURS TO H&S Comment MEMO: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR ORDER T O CONT CIVIL DETENTION PURS TO H&S CODES FILED BY COUNTY COUNSEL

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: STIP & ORDER (RE-HEALTH OFFICER ORDER FOR DEFT PURS TO HEALTH & SAFEY CODE 10290 121365, 121366, F Comment FILED: STIP & ORDER (RE-HEALTH OFFICER ORDER FOR DEFT PURS TO HEALTH & SAFEY CODE 10290, 121365, 121366, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY JENNIFER ARNOTT ON 08/20/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CSA: AT 11:01 COURT STANDS ADJOURNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FOS: FORMAL ORDER SUBMITTED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THE RESPONDENT UNDERSTANDS AND ACCEPTS THE TERMS OF THE STIPULATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: HEALTH CARE COMMUNITY WORKER THE COURT MAY ISSUE A WARRANT FOR THE RESPONDENT'S ARREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: INGEST HIS MEDICATION FOR TUBERCULOSIS AND IF THE RESPONDENT MISSES AN APPOINTMENT WITH THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: A HEALTH CARE COMMUNITY WORKER WILL VISIT THE RESPONDENT EVERY DAY TO WITNESS THE RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THE RESPONDENT MAY RETURN HOME BUT HE MUST CONTINUE THE TREATMENT FOR TUBERCULOSIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: A STIPULATION HAS BEEN SIGNED BY MS. ARCHER DR. SCOTT MORROW, FILIBERTO GUTIERREZ & MR. BRADY.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: DECLARATION OF DR. SCOTT MORROW IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE CIVIL DET Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF DR. SCOTT MORROW IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE CIVIL DET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR ORDER T O CONT CIVIL DETENTION PURS TO H&S Comment MEMO: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR ORDER T O CONT CIVIL DETENTION PURS TO H&S CODES FILED BY COUNTY COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment AP: PETITION OF GUITERREZ UPDATED TO ADD COUNTY COUNSEL AS PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORD FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL SRVD ON SAN MATEO CO COUNSEL ON 8/9/12 FILED. Comment FILED: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORD FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL SRVD ON SAN MATEO CO COUNSEL ON 8/9/12, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IN RE: CIVIL DETENTION UNDER HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTS SIGNED BY Comment O2: ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IN RE: CIVIL DETENTION UNDER HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTS, SIGNED BY RF ON 08/06/12 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request. Additional Info: REQUEST FOR HEARING FILED BY FILIBERTO GUITERREZ. Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR HEARING FILED BY FILIBERTO GUITERREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Petition. Additional Info: Comment PET: PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less