This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:55:52 (UTC).

IN RE 2,968.00

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 IN RE 2,968 00 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A and Miram, George A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5884

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A

Miram, George A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimant

HALEY, DALON

Defendant

$2,968.00

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Claimant Attorney

FEIGELSON, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE FILED Comment COF: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE FILED

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S WRIT OF MANDAMUS SERVED ON REBE Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S WRIT OF MANDAMUS SERVED ON REBECCA FEIGELSON ESQ. WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 01/04/13 FILED.

Conversion Action.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. Comment COMMI: CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF PETITION FOR FORFEITURE SERVED ON REBECCA FEIGELSON. ESQ. WITH A SERV Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF PETITION FOR FORFEITURE SERVED ON REBECCA FEIGELSON. ESQ. WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/13 FILED.

Notice.

NOTICE OF APPLICATION OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS & VERIFICATION AND EXHIBI Comment N2: NOTICE OF APPLICATION OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS & VERIFICATION AND EXHIBITS FILED BY DALON HALEY.

Document.

SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED. Comment FILED: SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS, FILED.

Document.

NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS, FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY ASIEVERT ON 01/31/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PDE: PETITION DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: MANDAMUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: LIMITED JURISDICTION COURT APPEARS TO BE AN ADEQUATE REMEDY AT LAW PRECLUDING THE REMEDY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: SUPPORTING THE PRESENT APPLICATION. FURTHER AND INDEPENDENTLY APPEAL FROM THE ORDERS OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: A PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT A. THERE IS NO DECLARATION FROM DALON HALEY AND THUS NO COMPETENT EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: NOTICE PRIOR TO FORFEITURE. SEE CABILLO DECLARATION IN THE NOTICE OF SEIZURE ATTACHED AS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: ONLY EVIDENCE PROFFERED IS THAT OFFICER CABILLO OF THE SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO POLICE GAVE TIMELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: DENIED. THERE IS NO EVIDENCE SUPPORTING INADEQUATE OR UNTIMELY NOTICE OF FORFEITURE. THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TRA: TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED AND BECOMES THE ORDER:

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF PETITION FOR FORFEITURE SERVED ON REBECCA FEIGELSON. ESQ. WITH A SERV Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF PETITION FOR FORFEITURE SERVED ON REBECCA FEIGELSON. ESQ. WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED. Comment FILED: SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. Comment COMMI: CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment AAI: ATTORNEY ADDED FOR PARTY DALON HALEY. ATTORNEY REBECCA FEIGELSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S WRIT OF MANDAMUS SERVED ON REBE Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S WRIT OF MANDAMUS SERVED ON REBECCA FEIGELSON ESQ. WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 01/04/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE OF APPLICATION OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS & VERIFICATION AND EXHIBI Comment N2: NOTICE OF APPLICATION OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS & VERIFICATION AND EXHIBITS FILED BY DALON HALEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Claim Opposing Forfeiture File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE FILED Comment COF: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less