This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 16:49:00 (UTC).

I. R., et al vs. THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC INC., et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 I R filed an Other lawsuit against THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1739

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

R., I.

K., J.

Defendants

THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC INC.

NATERA, INC.

DOES ONE THROUGH TEN, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONDON, SARAH R

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case 21-CIV-06237 Comment 21-CIV-06237

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Comment ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Order.

Order RE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Comment RE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF RELATED CASE Comment NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case OF CASE 21-CIV-06237; 21-CIV-06603; 21-CIV-01739 Comment OF CASE 21-CIV-06237; 21-CIV-06603; 21-CIV-01739

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on DAISY M Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on DAISY MONTENEGRO- ON BEHALF OF NATERA,INC., A CORPORATION

Order.

Order RE: Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases Comment RE: Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Comment ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of IRJK- ORDER AFTER FILING served on BARRY STOKES; PATRICK MARSH; LYN Comment IRJK- ORDER AFTER FILING served on BARRY STOKES; PATRICK MARSH; LYNDA VARGEM

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT NO. 1 Comment CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT NO. 1

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT NO. 1 Comment CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT NO. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order.; Additional Info: Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of IRJK- ORDER AFTER FILING served on BARRY STOKES; PATRICK MARSH; LYN Comment IRJK- ORDER AFTER FILING served on BARRY STOKES; PATRICK MARSH; LYNDA VARGEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Comment ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order RE: Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases Comment RE: Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on DAISY M Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on DAISY MONTENEGRO- ON BEHALF OF NATERA,INC., A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Related Case OF CASE 21-CIV-06237; 21-CIV-06603; 21-CIV-01739 Comment OF CASE 21-CIV-06237; 21-CIV-06603; 21-CIV-01739

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for R., I.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-016327-HOJ R., I. $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for R., I.; Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; R., I.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Related Case 21-CIV-06237 Comment 21-CIV-06237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Natera, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONDON SARAH ROBIN