This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 08:23:33 (UTC).

Howard Clarida vs. Metro Phones MP, et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Howard Clarida filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Metro Phones MP,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Greenberg, Susan and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0016

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Greenberg, Susan

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clarida, Howard

Defendants

Metro Phones MP

T-MOBILE USA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED, NIKOLAUS W

Defendant Attorney

SONG, JIANLIN

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) TO COMPLAINT Comment TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-009733-HOJ SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) TO COMPLAINT Comment TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clarida, Howard; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-000227-HOJ Clarida, Howard $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clarida, Howard; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; Clarida, Howard; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less