This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 20:09:23 (UTC).

MICHAEL HOSTAK vs SONIM TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 MICHAEL HOSTAK filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SONIM TECHNOLOGIES INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L, Weiner, Marie S, Grandsaert, John L, DAVIS, Weiner, Marie S. and Fineman, Nancy L.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6104

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

DAVIS

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L

Weiner, Marie S

Grandsaert, John L

Weiner, Marie S.

Fineman, Nancy L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOSTAK, MICHAEL

Defendants

PLASCHKE, ROBERT

SONIM TECHNOLOGIES INC.

SWENSON, SUSAN G.

HOCHSCHILD, MAURICE

WALKER, JAMES

LAKE STREET CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC.

NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION

YOUNG, KENNY

KNEUER, JOHN

OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC.

JOHNSON, JEFFREY D.

HOWE, ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASNOCH, JOHN T

 

Court Documents

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on TOM CULLUM Comment SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on TOM CULLUM

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

Notice.

Notice OF APPEARANCE Comment OF APPEARANCE

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on LAI SAEVAN Comment SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on LAI SAEVANG

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on JANE DOE Comment SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on JANE DOE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on TOM CULLUM Comment SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on TOM CULLUM

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES served on SEE SER Comment ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Order Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes Comment Order Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes

Order.

Order Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes Comment Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGESigned by: JUDGE DAVISDate Signed: 10/22/19 Comment Type: GRANTING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 10/22/19

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Conversion Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Peremptory Challenge Comment CLASS ACTION SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on LAI SAEVAN Comment SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on LAI SAEVANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on JANE DOE Comment SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on TOM CULLUM Comment SUMMONS; CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; ETC... served on TOM CULLUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Consolidated; Comment; Comment: (CONSOLIDATED WITH 19-CIV-05564)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase Consolidation Granted.; Additional Info: Comment Lead Case: 19-CIV-05564

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES served on SEE SER Comment ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for HOSTAK, MICHAEL; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-063697-HOJ CLASS ACTION RESEARCH & LITIGATION $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for HOSTAK, MICHAEL; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; HOSTAK, MICHAEL; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation.; Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClass Action Complex Notice.; Additional Info: Class Action Complex Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint CLASS ACTION SUIT Comment CLASS ACTION SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Securities Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonim Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lake Street Capital Markets, LLC is a litigant