This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/31/2022 at 00:10:50 (UTC).

HERLINDA CASIANO AND JUAN ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 04/06/2015 HERLINDA CASIANO AND JUAN ORTIZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DON R. FRANCHI, FRANCHI and Franchi, Don R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8708

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

DON R. FRANCHI

FRANCHI

Franchi, Don R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASIANO, HERLINDA LUCILA

Respondents

CASIANO ORTIZ, JUAN ORLANDO

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.

Respondent Attorney

BLASSER, WILLIAM N.

 

Court Documents

Family Law Status Conference.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment the conference is trailing the motion on spousal support Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.

Motion hearings.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment the hearing is regarding spousal support Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.

Motion hearings.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.

Family Law Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment conference to trail the pending motion Parties Present Petitioner: CASIANO, HERLINDA LUCILAAttorney: SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.RespondentAttorney: BLASSER, WILLIAM N.

Motion hearings.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: CASIANO, HERLINDA LUCILAAttorney: SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.RespondentAttorney: BLASSER, WILLIAM N.

Family Law Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.RespondentAttorney: BLASSER, WILLIAM N.

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: CASIANO, HERLINDA LUCILAAttorney: SUMMEROUR, RONALD W.Respondent: CASIANO ORTIZ, JUAN ORLANDOAttorney: BLASSER, WILLIAM N.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for CASIANO ORTIZ, JUAN ORLANDO; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-086710-HOJ CASIANO ORTIZ, JUAN ORLANDO $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for CASIANO ORTIZ, JUAN ORLANDO; Transaction Assessment $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for CASIANO, HERLINDA LUCILA; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-068346-HOJ CASIANO, HERLINDA LUCILA $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for CASIANO, HERLINDA LUCILA; Transaction Assessment $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketJudgment Entered on Reserved Issues.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketJudgment returned to Clerk's Office for processing.; Additional Info: Comment judgment signed on 5/22/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketJudgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature.; Additional Info: Comment 15 for signature

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketJudgment Received.; Additional Info: Comment ON RESERVED ISSUES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketStipulation & Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure.; Additional Info: Comment filed on 5/4/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF CASIANO SERVED ON JUAN ORLANDO CASIANO ORTIZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/28/15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment APET: AMENDED PETITION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 04/06/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted.; Additional Info: Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY HERLINDA LUCILA CASIANO GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 SIGNED BY DEPUTY CLERK HIGUERA ON 04/06/15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY HERLINDA LUCILA CASIANO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY HERLINDA LUCILA CASIANO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLASSER WILLIAM NICHOLAS