This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/19/2022 at 08:24:51 (UTC).

Henry A. Rodriguez vs. Myrna Lopez Soriano, et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Henry A Rodriguez filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Myrna Lopez Soriano. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FINEMAN, Fineman, Nancy L., Healy, Nicole S, Chou, Danny Y, HEALY, FINEMAN; FORWARDED, FINEMAN; FORWARDED TO DEPT 1, Fineman, Nancy L and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5605

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

FINEMAN

Fineman, Nancy L.

Healy, Nicole S

Chou, Danny Y

HEALY

FINEMAN; FORWARDED

FINEMAN; FORWARDED TO DEPT 1

Fineman, Nancy L

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Henry A.

Defendants

Seton Medical Center

Verity Health

Soriano, Myrna Lopez

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

MEDICAL CENTER FOR DIABETES AND METABOLIC CARE, INC

VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ISON, JAMES J.

Defendant Attorneys

COWDEN, MARC G.

LANDESS, BRET R

 

Court Documents

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAI Comment OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer to Amended Complaint.

Demurrer to Amended Complaint SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Complaint.

Complaint

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Order.

Order SUSTAINING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment SUSTAINING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice as to VERITY HEALTH/SETON MEDICA Comment With Prejudice as to VERITY HEALTH/SETON MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Trial Setting Conference.

Original Type Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Trial Setting Conference 03/09/2022 Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Continued Party's motion

Joint Case Management Statement.

Joint Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Original Type Case Management and Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 11/17/2021 Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; Rodriguez, Henry A.; Soriano, Myrna Lopez; VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA, INC; Seton Medical Center; DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE; MEDICAL CENTER FOR DIABETES AND METABOLIC CARE, INC; Comment: FILED ON 4/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA, INC; Seton Medical Center; Comment: DISMISSAL AS TO VERITY HEALTH/SETON MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice as to VERITY HEALTH/SETON MEDICA Comment With Prejudice as to VERITY HEALTH/SETON MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint.; Additional Info: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez, Henry A.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-049038-HOJ Rodriguez, Henry A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez, Henry A.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Rodriguez, Henry A.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Seton Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J Ison