This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 22:24:50 (UTC).

HAYLEY JOHNSEN VS BIANCA LISSETTE ARANDA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 HAYLEY JOHNSEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BIANCA LISSETTE ARANDA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V Raymond, Cretan, Clifford V, Bergeron, Joseph E, Novak, Lisa A, Novak, Lisa A., Cretan, Clifford V., Swope, V. Raymond, Grandsaert, John L, CLIFFORD V. CRETAN, JOSEPH E. BERGERON, BERGERON, LISA A. NOVAK, V. RAYMOND SWOPE and FOILES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5054

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bergeron, Joseph E

Cretan, Clifford V

Swope, V Raymond

Novak, Lisa A

Swope, V. Raymond

Novak, Lisa A.

Cretan, Clifford V.

Grandsaert, John L

CLIFFORD V. CRETAN

JOSEPH E. BERGERON

BERGERON

LISA A. NOVAK

V. RAYMOND SWOPE

FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSEN, HAYLEY

Defendants

ARANDA, OLIVIA

ARANDA, JESUS

ARANDA, BIANCA LISSETTE

GONZALEZ, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENT, ADAM C.

Defendant Attorneys

RENDLER, DEVEREAUX

SMITH, CARY S

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

COMPLAINT (3) Comment ACS: (U) 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JOHNSEN FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment REQDD: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JOHNSEN AS TO DEFENDANT JUAN GONZALEZ WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (7) Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Ex Parte.

APPLICATION Comment EPA: EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE FOILES ON 8/12/13, TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN

Conversion Action.

FILING Comment DFJ: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BIANCA LISSETTE ARANDA JESUS ARANDA, OLIVIA ARANDA

Motion.

NOTICE (9) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTS FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER (2) Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JOHNSEN FILED BY JUAN GONZALEZ REPRESENTED BY CARY S SMITH

Motion.

NOTICE (3) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY JUAN GONZALEZ

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ORDER (2) Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 02/07/13

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, FILED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF ANNE E. VERNON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF ANNE E. VERNON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES

Document.

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES FILED. Comment FILED: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES, FILED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELL Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTS

Motion.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTS FILED B Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTS FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN

Notice.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SETTING NEW TRIAL DATE FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN. Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SETTING NEW TRIAL DATE FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN.

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; ARANDA, OLIVIA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; ARANDA, JESUS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; ARANDA, BIANCA LISSETTE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; JOHNSEN, HAYLEY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • DocketSettlement Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 01:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Statement.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY HAYLEY JOHNSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JOHNSEN SERVED ON BIANCA LISSET Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JOHNSEN SERVED ON BIANCA LISSETTE ARANDA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/15/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHNSEN, HAYLEY; Case Payment Receipt # 201206290130 JOHNSEN, HAYLEY $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHNSEN, HAYLEY; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; JOHNSEN, HAYLEY; Total Financial Assessment $845.00; Total Payments and Credits $845.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/28/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0130-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI1-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER

JOHNSEN v. ARANDA, et. al. CIV 515054

4. [_] Piaintiff (name): is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

and has complied with the fictitious business name laws. 5. Each defendant named above is a natural person

a. [__] except defendant (name): c. [_] except defendant (name): (1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (1) [__] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) ] a comporation . (2) [_] a corporation (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [C_] an unincorporated entity (describe)- (4) (] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (5) [[_] other (specify): (5) (] other (specify): b. [_] except defendant (name): d. [_] except defendant (name): (1) ] a business organization, form unknown (1) ] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [__] a corporation (2) [__] a corporation (3) ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) ] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] apublic entity (describe): (5) [_] other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify):

[_] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 5.

6. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

a. Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1-12 were the agents or employees of other named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

b. Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 13-25 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff. 7. [_] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

8. This court is the proper court because a. at least one defendant now resides in its jurisdictional area. b. [_] the principal place of business of a defendant corporation or unincorporated association is in its jurisdictional area. c. injury to person or damage to personal property occurred in its jurisdictional area.

d. [_] other (specify):

9 [] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [__] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or ~b. [_] is excused from complying because (specify):

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER

JOHNSEN v. ARANDA, et. al. CIV 515054

Date: JULY 19,2012

The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached):

. Motor Vehicle

. General Negligence

[ Intentional Tort

[_] Products Liability

[_] Premises Liability

[ ] Other (specify):

~0ao0ow

Plaintiff has suffered

. [_] wage loss

[ loss of use of property

hospital and medical expenses general damage

[_] property damage

loss of eaming capacity

: other damage (specify):

Past and future pain and suffering

@0 a0 oW

(] The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationships of plaintiff to the deceased are a. [__] listed in Attachment 12. b. [_] as follows:

The relief sought in this complaint is within the jurisdiction of this court.

Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. (1) compensatory damages (2) (] punitive damages The amount of damages is (in cases for personal injury or wrongful death, you must check (1)): (1) according to proof (2) ] in the amount of- $

[ The paragraphs of this complaint alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

ANNE VERNON {TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENT, ADAM C.