This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:07:43 (UTC).

GUADALUPE VILLALOBOS VS ESTATE OF STACY WHITE

Case Summary

On 06/25/2012 GUADALUPE VILLALOBOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESTATE OF STACY WHITE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4810

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUADALUPE VILLALOBOS

VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE

Defendant

ESTATE OF STACY WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACHIMOWICZ, JOSHUA D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (4) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUADALUPE VILLALOBOS.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (3) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUADALUPE VILLALOBOS.

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 08/07/13 FILED.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUADALUPE VILLALOBOS.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUADALUPE VILLALOBOS.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: ESTATE OF STACY WHITE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: VILLALOBOS GUADALUPE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE IN A TIMELY MANNER 10/08/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing. Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:01 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE IN A TIMELY MANNER 10/08/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:01 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY LORRAINE ON 12/03/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/04/14 AT 09:01 IN DEPARTMENT 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AT: ATTORNEY(S): CHRIS WILHELMS FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Comment JCR: HONORABLE STEVEN L. DYLINA, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: LORRAINE GUERRERO. COURT REPORTER: MEGAN ZALMAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0554-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • Financial info for VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE : Case Payment Receipt # 201302040610 VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • Financial info for VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260554 VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: VILLALOBOS, GUADALUPE; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBERĀ®

Villalobos v. Estate of White

4. [_] Plaintiff (name): is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

and has complied with the fictitious business name laws. 5. Each defendant named above is a natural person

a. except defendant (name): Estate of Stacy White cĀ¢. [_] except defendant (name):

(1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (2) [__] a corporation (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) [__] a public entity (describe): (5) [ X] other (specify): Estate of Stacy White

b. [_] except defendant (name):

(1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (2) [_] a corporation (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) (] a public entity (describe):

(1) [_] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) (] a corporation (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) (] a public entity (describe):

(5) [_] other (spscify):

d. [_] except defendant (name):

(1) [ abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [__] a corporation (3) [_] an unincomorated entity (describe):

(4) [_] a public entity (describe):

(5) [_] other (specify): (5) [_] other (specify):

[ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 5.

6. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

a. Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1 through 10 were the agents or employees of other named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

b. [X_] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1 through 10 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

7. [_] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

8. This court is the proper court because a. [__] atleast one defendant now resides in its jurisdictional area. b. [_] the principal place of business of a defendant corporation or unincorporated association is in its jurisdictional area. C. injury to person or damage to personal property occurred in its jurisdictional area.

d. [_] other (specify):

9. [_] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [__) has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [_] is excused from complying because (specify):

PLD-PI-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007]