This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 03:54:21 (UTC).

Greta Vandersterre vs. Jose Angel Lopez Perez, et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Greta Vandersterre filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose Angel Lopez Perez,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mau, Michael L, Halperin, Ernst A and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5341

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mau, Michael L

Halperin, Ernst A

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vandersterre, Greta

Defendants

Ponce, Patricia Lopez

Lopez Perez, Jose Angel

DOES 1 TO 35

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASS, BRADLEY M.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order.

Order Order Dismissing Entire Action Without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution Comment Order Dismissing Entire Action Without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 02/02/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/02/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Plaintiff's Counsel, Bradley Kass passed away in 2021

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 7/28/2022 at 9:00 am Comment 7/28/2022 at 9:00 am

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/28/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Commenced Comment *Plaintiff's Counsel passed away in 2021

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 4/28/2022 at 9:00 am Comment 4/28/2022 at 9:00 am

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Party; Names; Vandersterre, Greta; Lopez Perez, Jose Angel; Ponce, Patricia Lopez; DOES 1 TO 35; Comment: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Comment Order Dismissing Entire Action Without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Order Dismissing Entire Action Without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution Comment Order Dismissing Entire Action Without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 02/02/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/02/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Plaintiff's Counsel, Bradley Kass passed away in 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 7/28/2022 at 9:00 am Comment 7/28/2022 at 9:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/28/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Commenced Comment *Plaintiff's Counsel passed away in 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 4/28/2022 at 9:00 am Comment 4/28/2022 at 9:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vandersterre, Greta; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-046771-HOJ Vandersterre, Greta $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vandersterre, Greta; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Vandersterre, Greta; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/01/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less