Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 16:47:14 (UTC).

Green Quest vs. Michael Roberts Construction, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Green Quest filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Roberts Construction, Inc . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2686

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PT MASONRY

Green Quest

Defendants

DOES 1-50

Michael Roberts Construction, Inc.

AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEWBERRY, ROBERT H.

Defendant Attorneys

KORBEL, GREGORY J

ROONEY, KEVIN F.

 

Court Documents

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Order.

Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADR PACKAGE; Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE served on DENISE WYNNE - AGENT FOR SERVICE

Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens).

Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023615-HOJ AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-021697-HOJ Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Michael Roberts Construction, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens). Additional Info: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Green Quest : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-018552-HOJ Green Quest dba P T Masonry $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Green Quest : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Green Quest; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant