Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/21/2021 at 00:26:28 (UTC).

Grace Lalangan, et al vs. Ali Khostovan, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Grace Lalangan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ali Khostovan. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S., Weiner, Marie S and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3961

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S.

Weiner, Marie S

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lalangan, Grace

Shen, Nicholas

Defendants

Khostovan, Ali

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, ZOI AMARA

Defendant Attorney

JUNGWIRTH, DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer..

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- SERVED JANE D Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- SERVED JANE DOE COMPETENT MEMBER OF HOUSEHOLD

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: Lalangan Grace; Shen, Nicholas; Khostovan, Ali; DOES 1 TO 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Meet and confer.. Additional Info: CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- SERVED JANE D Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- SERVED JANE DOE COMPETENT MEMBER OF HOUSEHOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lalangan, Grace : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036267-HOJ Lalangan, Grace $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lalangan, Grace : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Lalangan, Grace; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Zoi Amara