This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 18:07:05 (UTC).

Goldman Sachs Bank USA vs. Gordon Wong, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Goldman Sachs Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gordon Wong. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1130

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldman Sachs Bank USA

Defendants

Wong, Gordon

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, JANET L.

Defendant Attorney

QUAN, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO DEPT 34 STIP/ORD TO ADR Judicial Officer Halperin, Ernst A. Comment DEPT 34, STIP/ORD TO ADR

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Collections Case Management Conference - 9/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Comment Collections Case Management Conference - 9/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference Case Management Conference 09/09/2021 ~CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: QUAN, ANDREW

Answer (Limited $10K to $25K).

Answer (Limited $10K to $25K) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wong, Gordon : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-037232-HOJ Wong, Gordon $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wong, Gordon : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment & Attorney Paula Skerston for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Goldman Sachs Bank USA : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-008900-HOJ Goldman Sachs Bank USA $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Goldman Sachs Bank USA : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Goldman Sachs Bank USA; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JANET L