This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 16:44:23 (UTC).

GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC. vs. JOHN MACNAUGHTON, et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN MACNAUGHTON,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, WEINER and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3344

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

WEINER

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

MACNAUGHTON, JOHN

CAMBRIDGE BUILDERS

TRAN, HOA THI

LAO, ANTHONY ON

LAO, NICOLE

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

MERS

DOES ONE THROUGH ONE HUNDRED, INCLUSIVE

MACNAUGHTON, CECELIA

CAMVRIDGE BUILDERS

DOES 1 TO 10

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

TRAN, HOA THI

LAO, ANTHONY ON

LAO, NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COOPERSMITH, MARC D.

HEDSTROM, BRIAN P

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MCDONNELL, JOHN L., III

POMEROY, TIMOTHY R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/15/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT Comment DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment by Court.

Default Judgment by Court SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER ON 2/10/2023 Comment SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER ON 2/10/2023

Proposed Judgment Received.

Proposed Judgment Received DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FORWARD TO DEPT 2 Comment DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FORWARD TO DEPT 2

Declaration.

Declaration OF ERIC HIGGINBOTHAM IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF LEGAL COSTS Comment OF ERIC HIGGINBOTHAM IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF LEGAL COSTS

Request For.

Request For Court Judgment Comment Court Judgment

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 2/15/2023 at 10:00 AM Comment 2/15/2023 at 10:00 AM

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Complaint.

Complaint

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATION FOR NON-MONETARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT; ORDER THEREONSigned Comment Type: STIPULATION FOR NON-MONETARY INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT; ORDER THEREON Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 12/7/2022; MAILED TO ALDRIDGE PITE LLP BY KIMBERLY CLAUSSEN ON 12/8/2022

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; NOTICE O Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; CROSS- COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/15/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC.; Awarded Against; MACNAUGHTON, JOHN; Amount; Comment: PLAINTIFF IS NOT EXEMPT FROM USURY LAWS. FURTHUR THE $22,000 INCLUDES PAST INTEREST CHARGES, PER DECLARATION.; Party; Names; GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC.; MACNAUGHTON, JOHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT Comment DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment by Court.; Additional Info: Default Judgment by Court SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER ON 2/10/2023 Comment SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER ON 2/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Judgment Received DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FORWARD TO DEPT 2 Comment DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FORWARD TO DEPT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens).; Additional Info: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-030169-HOJ Golden State Lumber, Inc., a California corporation $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less