This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/09/2023 at 21:00:03 (UTC).

GLORY ARICHE, et al vs. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 GLORY ARICHE, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A, Mau, Michael L, Fineman, Nancy L, Grandsaert, John L and Healy, Nicole S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2259

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Mau, Michael L

Fineman, Nancy L

Grandsaert, John L

Healy, Nicole S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDDINGTON, WENDE

ARICHE, GLORY

SCHROEDER, JAMEISE

Defendants

WESTIN HOTELS AND RESORTS

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

DOES 1-50

WESTIN LAKE LAS VEGAS RESORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASS, BRADLEY M.

Defendant Attorneys

HUGHES, PETER M.

MCALEER, LINDA S.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMC 12/2/20 Comment CMC 12/2/20

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Request.

Request FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34 Comment FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/29/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Comment GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ADR PACKET, ETC. SERVED C Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ADR PACKET, ETC. SERVED CT CORP- CARLOS PAZ

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF PETER M. HUGHES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN P Comment OF PETER M. HUGHES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION

Motion to Dismiss.

Motion to Dismiss RENEWED MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TODISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FORDELAY IN P Comment RENEWED MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS IN AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF PETER M. HUGHES

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 8/10/2023 at 9:00 AM Comment 8/10/2023 at 9:00 AM

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/20/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Court's Motion

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 01/19/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Motion to Dismiss.

Original Type Motion to Dismiss ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Dismiss 01/10/2023 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS IN AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF PETER M. HUGHES

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF PETER M. HUGHES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION Comment OF PETER M. HUGHES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Healy Nicole S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FORDELAY IN PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-013900-HOJ MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.; Transaction Assessment $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support.; Additional Info: Declaration in Support OF PETER M. HUGHES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN P Comment OF PETER M. HUGHES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss.; Additional Info: Motion to Dismiss RENEWED MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TODISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FORDELAY IN P Comment RENEWED MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS IN AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF PETER M. HUGHES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 8/10/2023 at 9:00 AM Comment 8/10/2023 at 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Attorney Linda McAleer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/20/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 10/23/19 Comment CMC 10/23/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARICHE, GLORY; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-025538-HOJ KASS, BRADLEY $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARICHE, GLORY; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; ARICHE, GLORY; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less