This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/29/2022 at 05:45:36 (UTC).

GLORY ARICHE, et al vs. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 GLORY ARICHE, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L, Halperin, Ernst A and Grandsaert, John L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2259

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L

Halperin, Ernst A

Grandsaert, John L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDDINGTON, WENDE

ARICHE, GLORY

SCHROEDER, JAMEISE

Defendants

WESTIN HOTELS AND RESORTS

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

DOES 1-50

WESTIN LAKE LAS VEGAS RESORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASS, BRADLEY M.

Defendant Attorney

HOYNACKI, DAVID A

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMC 12/2/20 Comment CMC 12/2/20

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Request.

Request FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34 Comment FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/29/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Comment GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ADR PACKET, ETC. SERVED C Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ADR PACKET, ETC. SERVED CT CORP- CARLOS PAZ

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCESigned by: COMMISSIONER HALPERINDate Signed: 8/10/21 Comment Type: GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE Signed by: COMMISSIONER HALPERIN Date Signed: 8/10/21

Request.

Request FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34 Comment FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 05/19/22 due to plaintiffs not being rep'd (per stip filed 08/16/21).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket2nd Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 02/18/22 per stip/o filed 08/16/21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCESigned by: COMMISSIONER HALPERINDate Signed: 8/10/21 Comment Type: GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE Signed by: COMMISSIONER HALPERIN Date Signed: 8/10/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-032599-HOJ MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest.; Additional Info: Request FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34 Comment FOR CONTINUANCE FWD TO DEPT. 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket1st Time Extension granted for Filing of Stipulation to ADR.; Additional Info: Comment Until 07/30/2021 per P's atty by LC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-021880-HOJ MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 10/23/19 Comment CMC 10/23/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARICHE, GLORY; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-025538-HOJ KASS, BRADLEY $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARICHE, GLORY; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; ARICHE, GLORY; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less