Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 03:41:56 (UTC).

GILMA IDALIA RAUDA SOLORZANO and GODO ROSENDO MENDEZ MENDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 GILMA IDALIA RAUDA SOLORZANO and GODO ROSENDO MENDEZ MENDEZ was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Reyna, Renee C., Zorfas, Lauren, Cordova, Paula, Cordova, Paula and Reyna, Renee C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1694

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Reyna, Renee C.

Zorfas, Lauren

Cordova, Paula, Cordova, Paula

Reyna, Renee C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAUDA SOLORZANO, GILMA IDALIA

Respondent

MENDEZ MENDEZ, GODO ROSENDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAVALLINO, CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing. Additional Info: Comment Signed By: L. ZORFAS Date Signed: 12/17/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketConfidential CLETS Information RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOrder received/forwarded to Judicial Officer - Public. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Zorfas Lauren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketInterpreter present. Additional Info: Comment Spanish: Rosa Dart interprets for Plaintiff Gilma Solorzano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketParty shall prepare formal order consistent w/order herein. Additional Info: Comment Plaintiff's counsel: Charles Cavallino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge. Additional Info: Comment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing. Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Zorfas Lauren Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: RAUDA SOLORZANO, GILMA IDALIARespondent: MENDEZ MENDEZ, GODO ROSENDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFCS Report submitted to the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFCS Mediation - Regular. Additional Info: Original Type FCS Mediation - Regular Judicial Officer(s) Cordova Paula, Cordova, Paula Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result FCS Appointment Completed - Partial agreement Parties Present Petitioner: RAUDA SOLORZANO, GILMA IDALIARespondent: MENDEZ MENDEZ, GODO ROSENDO

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing. Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDV - Documents Picked Up.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order. Additional Info: Comment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Application - DV Prevention with Minor Child File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge. Additional Info: Comment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAVALLINO, CHARLES