This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 16:02:26 (UTC).

GERALDINE DALIDA vs. TARGET CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 GERALDINE DALIDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2011

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DALIDA, GERALDINE

Defendants

TARGET CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSEN, BRIAN L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court CASE NUMBER: 3:22-cv-03509 Comment CASE NUMBER: 3:22-cv-03509

Notice.

Notice NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Comment NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Comment NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.; Additional Info: Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court CASE NUMBER: 3:22-cv-03509 Comment CASE NUMBER: 3:22-cv-03509

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DALIDA, GERALDINE; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-019184-HOJ Dalida, Geraldine $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DALIDA, GERALDINE; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; DALIDA, GERALDINE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larsen, Brian L.