This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:20 (UTC).

GERALD F PREINER VS KENT SATO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 GERALD F PREINER filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against KENT SATO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6202

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PREINER, GERALD F

GELLER, JAMES M

Defendants

SATO, KENT

PRINCIPAL EQUITY INC.

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

GREENFIELD REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIDGES, MARK S

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

Conversion Action.

WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (3) Comment PSUO: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 FILED. TYPE OF SERVICE: POSTING/MAILING DATE: 07/06/12

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF PREINER AS TO KENT SATO BY SUB-SERVING JOHN WILLIAM CAMPBELL. MAILING DATE OF 07/06/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF PREINER AS TO KENT SATO BY SUB-SERVING JOHN WILLIAM CAMPBELL. MAILING DATE OF 07/06/12.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF PREINER AS TO KENT SATO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: PREINER GERALD F; GELLER, JAMES M; Awarded Against: SATO, KENT; ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/24/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF PREINER FOR GERALD F PREINER, JAMES M GELLER JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF PREINER AGAINST KENT SATO, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 1799 BAYSHORE HIGHWAY SUITE 168A,B C AND D BURLINGAME CA. 94010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/24/12 -- SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120724-0144-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment WPRP1: (L) WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFPP: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 1799 BAYSHORE HIGHWAY SUITE 168AB C AND D BURLINGAME CA. 94010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF PREINER AGAINST KENT SATO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF PREINER FOR GERALD F PREINER JAMES M GELLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JOAF1: JUDGMENT ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice. Additional Info: Comment UDN: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING NOTICES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES PER CCP 1161.2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Case Sealed by Order. Additional Info: Comment SEALUD: UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SEALED PER CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment TUDM: (L) TRACK ASSIGNMENT: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0011-CK 171/ 240.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 1799 BAYSHORE HIGHWAY SUITE 168AB C AND D BURLINGAME, CA94010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for PREINER, GERALD F : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270011 PREINER, GERALD F $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for PREINER, GERALD F : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: PREINER, GERALD F; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less