This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:01:09 (UTC).

GENESIS RECOVERY VS DEMETRA P TINMAZ ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 GENESIS RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEMETRA P TINMAZ ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5849

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC

TINMAZ, DEMETRA

TURTLE CREEK ASSETS LTD

FORWARD PROPERTIESINTERNATIONAL INC

CHASE BANK USA NA

Defendants

DEMETRA P DEMETRA

DEMETRA, DEMETRA P

TINMAZ, DEMETRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC AS TO DEMETRA P DEMETRA BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, MANAGER/PERSON IN CHARGE. MAILING DATE OF 08/13/12.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/19/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (CCP 1033)

Conversion Action.

WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE VENUE

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION RE-INTEREST FILED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC AS TO DEMETRA P DEMETRA.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $83.16, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNTS STATED

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC; Awarded Against: DEMETRA DEMETRA P; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/19/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC FOR GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DEMETRA P DEMETRA PRINCIPAL IS $5,587.43. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $1,390.77. COSTS ARE $280.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,258.20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 131009-0602-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7366.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $83.16, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION RE-INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $7258.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $280.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $1390.77.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120807-0254-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201208070254 GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial: GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less