This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:01:13 (UTC).

GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES VS TERI X XIRAKIS ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERI X XIRAKIS ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Bergeron, Joseph E, Swope, V Raymond and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5848

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Bergeron, Joseph E

Swope, V Raymond

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC

PETERSON, TERI

YAZDI, TERI X

FORWARD PROPERTIESINTERNATIONAL INC

CHASE BANK USA NA

TURTLE CREEK ASSETS LTD

Defendants

TERI X XIRAKIS

PETERSON, TERI

XIRAKIS, TERI X

YAZDI, TERI X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: PLAINTIFF'S DECL. IN LIEU OF LIVE WITNESS TESTIMON AT TRIAL PURS. TO {CCP 98} FILED.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER SERVED ON GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/20/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC FILED BY TERI X XIRAKIS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

Conversion Action.

FILING Comment AIMCT1: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC. TIME ESTIMATE: 02:00 HOUR(S)

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE (4) Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY TERI X XIRAKIS GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $225.00 SIGNED BY VRS ON 09/24/12.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Notice.

NOTICE (2) Comment N2: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS AS ADMITTED PER CRC 3.1304(C) FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC.

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE) TIME ESTIMATE 02:00 HOURS

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC AS TO TERI X XIRAKIS BY SUB-SERVING SAEED YAZDI, SPOUSE/CO-OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 08/15/12.

Notice.

NOTICE (3) Comment N: NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC.

Motion.

NOTICE Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION TO DEEM FACTS AS ADMITTED FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: XIRAKIS TERI X; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Statement. Additional Info: NOTICE (4) Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment *620*: HCMO CALENDARED ON 07/08/14 IN DEPT. TBA. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 07/08/14 IN DEPT. 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY K. CALDWELL ON 07/09/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFNAR: IF A JUDGMENT IS FILED THEN NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment DFNAR: IF A DISMISSAL IS FILED THEN NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HCMO: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT SET FOR 07/08/14 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT TBA

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120807-0305-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Financial info for GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201301230439 GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Financial info for GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201208070305 GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial: GENESIS RECOVERY SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment $285.00; Total Payments and Credits $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less