This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 16:51:00 (UTC).

Geico Indemnity Company vs. Teresa Hernandez , et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Geico Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Teresa Hernandez . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4976

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geico Indemnity Company

Defendants

Hernandez , Teresa

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAULUS, CHERIE L.

Defendant Attorney

WOLLER, JOHN S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer (Limited $10K to $25K).

Answer (Limited $10K to $25K) Answer to PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer to PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hernandez , Teresa : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-046749-HOJ Hernandez , Teresa $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hernandez , Teresa : Transaction Assessment $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Hernandez , Teresa; Total Financial Assessment $520.00; Total Payments and Credits $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees. Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Limited $10K to $25K). Additional Info: Answer (Limited $10K to $25K) Answer to PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer to PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Geico Indemnity Company : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-037998-HOJ Geico Indemnity Company $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Geico Indemnity Company : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Geico Indemnity Company; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLLER JOHN S.