This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 21:53:09 (UTC).

GCFS, INC. VS REYNALDO GREGORIO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 GCFS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REYNALDO GREGORIO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4908

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GREGORIO, REYNALDO

GREGORIO, REYNALDO L., JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUSHING-KLINE, BRIGHTON

HUSHING-KLINE, BRIGHTON K.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest $14 Comment and declaration of accrued interest $1406.35, COSTS $303.00, CREDIT 0.00

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit INTEREST: 1,546.24 COSTS: 303.00 Comment INTEREST: 1,546.24 COSTS: 303.00

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $44.67, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF GCFS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 8/4/16Amount: 5042.43 Comment County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 8/4/16 Amount: 5042.43

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: SAN JOAQUINStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 12/20/17Amount: 5756.40 Comment County: SAN JOAQUIN Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 12/20/17 Amount: 5756.40

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit INTEREST: 1,546.24COSTS: 303.00 Comment INTEREST: 1,546.24 COSTS: 303.00

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest $14 Comment and declaration of accrued interest $1406.35, COSTS $303.00, CREDIT 0.00

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 962 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 962.27, COSTS 173.00.

Document.

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY, FILED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $353.50, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $173.00 ---

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $44.67, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 03/07/14 AS FOLLOWS: Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 03/07/14 AS FOLLOWS:

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Return.; Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 8/4/16Amount: 5042.43 Comment County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 8/4/16 Amount: 5042.43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Return.; Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: SAN JOAQUINStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 12/20/17Amount: 5756.40 Comment County: SAN JOAQUIN Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 12/20/17 Amount: 5756.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-086202-HOJ GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued.; Additional Info: Comment to the County of SAN JOAQUIN Issued On: 12-20-17 Amount: 5756.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.; Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit INTEREST: 1,546.24COSTS: 303.00 Comment INTEREST: 1,546.24 COSTS: 303.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.; Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest $14 Comment and declaration of accrued interest $1406.35, COSTS $303.00, CREDIT 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Mail Payment Receipt # 2016-033728-HOJ GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketWrit Issued.; Additional Info: Comment LOS ANGELES; 5042.43

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Case Payment Receipt # 201206270262 GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $231.00; Total Payments and Credits $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION RE VENUE FOR PERSONAL FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS FILED BY GCFS INC. A CALIFORNIA Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FOR PERSONAL FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS FILED BY GCFS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0262-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER GCFS, INC. vs REYNALDO GREGORIO

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [0 Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

C. D Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d.[] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5.[] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a.[J has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b.[] is excused from complying because (specify):

6.[] This actionis subject to [J cCivil Code section 1812.10 [] Civil Code section 2984.4. 7. This court is the proper court because a.[] adefendant entered into the contract here.

b.[] adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into.

c.DJ adefendant lives here now.

d. |:| the contract was to be performed here.

e.[] adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. f.[] real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

g.[] other (specify):

8. The following causes of adion are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): D] Breach of Contract Common Counts

X [0 oOther (specify): X

9. Other allegations: GCFS, INC. is a successor in interest to CASH CALL, INC.

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a.[X] damages of: $2,437.77 b.X] interest on the damages

() [ according to proof

()X at the rate of (specify): 10.00 percent per year from (date): 9-30-10 c.X] attomey's fees

(M of: $ 487.55*

(2 [ according to proof. d. X other (specify): 1. Costs of suit. 2. For other and further relief as the Court deems proper. *Attorney fees calculated as to first cause of action only. 11.[J The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

BRIGHTON HUSHING-KLINE (TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUSHING-KLINE BRIGHTON KILIAN