This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:48:57 (UTC).

GARY J ARATA ETAL VS LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA ETAL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2014 GARY J ARATA ETAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etezadi, Susan I, Dylina, Steven L, Dylina, Steven L., Etezadi, Susan I. and Miram, George A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1627

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etezadi, Susan I

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

Etezadi, Susan I.

Miram, George A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GARY J ARATA

LOUIS J ARATA

ARATA, GARY J

OF THE CLARENCE AND LILLAN ARATA 2002 TRUST

OF THE JOHN AND GRACE ARATA 2004 TRUST

CO-TRUSTEE O TH EJOHN & GRACE ARATA 2004 TR

CO-TRUSTEE O THE JOHN & GRACE ARATA 2004 TR

ARATA, LOUIS J

ARATA, LAURA

PENINSULA OPEN SPACE TRUST a California nonprofit public benefit corp

DEENEY, JAMES RICHARD

DEENEY, JESSICA ANN

WYVERN RESTAURANT INC 401 K PROFIT SHARING PLAN.

WRIGHT, SHARON S

CARNEY, PATRICK J

VER LINDEN, DANIEL RALPH

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA

ARATA, LILLIAN LOUISE

OF THE CLARENCE AND LILLAN ARATA 2002 TRUST

THE ERNEST J. MCNABB REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST DATED

Plaintiff, Trustee and Cross Defendant

ARATA, LAURA

Not Classified By Court

Payor

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Trustee Attorneys

MILLER, MICHAEL S.

DAMBACHER, GARY P.

SULLIVAN, BRADLEY W.

WOODWARD, PERRY J

GALANTER, TAMARA S

ABBEY, RICHARD W

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LOWREY, LLOYD W, JR

HANSEN, CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: L + G LLP ATTORNEYS AT LAW New Attorney: BRADLEY W. Comment Former Attorney: L + G, LLP ATTORNEYS AT LAW New Attorney: BRADLEY W. SULLIVAN Former Attorney: PAUL A. ROVELLA New Attorney: BRADLEY W. SULLIVAN

Order.

Order Order Assigning Case for All Purposes - signed by Judge Etezadi 3/13/2017 Order Comment Order Assigning Case for All Purposes - signed by Judge Etezadi 3/13/2017

Order.

Order Order Assigning Case for All Purposes - signed by Judge Etezadi 3/13/2017 Order Comment Order Assigning Case for All Purposes - signed by Judge Etezadi 3/13/2017

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA AS TO JESSICA AN Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA AS TO JESSICA ANN DEENEY BY SUB-SERVING NSTSNSTS FRRNRY (MOTHER/WHITE). MAILING DATE OF 08/03/15.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA AS TO PENINSULA Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA AS TO PENINSULA OPEN SPACE TRUST BY SUB-SERVING HEATHER KANTOR - AUTHORIZED AGENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/22/15.

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA FILED Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA FILED

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF ARATA FILED BY LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA REPRESENTED BY LLOYD W LOWREY JR Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF ARATA FILED BY LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA, REPRESENTED BY LLOYD W LOWREY JR

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GARY J ARATA LOUIS J ARATA. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GARY J ARATA, LOUIS J ARATA.

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: MICHAEL S MILLER New Attorney: GARY P DAMBACHER Comment Former Attorney: MICHAEL S MILLER New Attorney: GARY P DAMBACHER

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPOINT REFEREE EXTEND DEADLINE SIGNED BY JOHN L. GRANDSAERT ON 10/01/15. Comment SO2: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPOINT REFEREE, EXTEND DEADLINE SIGNED BY JOHN L. GRANDSAERT ON 10/01/15.

Notice.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA. Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED. Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA FILED BY WYVERN RESTAURANT INC 401 K PROFIT SHAR Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA FILED BY WYVERN RESTAURANT INC 401 K PROFIT SHARING PATRICK J CARNEY, SHARON S WRIGHT TR , REPRESENTED BY RICHARD W ABBEY

Conversion Action.

(U) 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT) Comment ACS: (U) 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARATA FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LILLIAN LOUISE ARATA.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Default Entered; Party; Name: VER LINDEN DANIEL RALPH; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: DEENEY, JESSICA ANN; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: DEENEY, JAMES RICHARD; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Order. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Order 07/25/2019 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment INSTRUCTING THE REFEREE TO SELL THE ARATA RANCH PROPERTY WITHOUT RESERVING A LIFE ESTATE AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections to Evidence. Additional Info: Objections to Evidence HRG: 7/25/2019 - Objections to Evidence and New Points Submitted With Reply Comment HRG: 7/25/2019 - Objections to Evidence and New Points Submitted With Reply Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Association of Counsel / Attorney. Additional Info: Association of Counsel / Attorney HRG: 7/25/2019 - Association of Counsel to Specially Appear on Mot Comment HRG: 7/25/2019 - Association of Counsel to Specially Appear on Motion for Order Instructing Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections to Evidence. Additional Info: Objections to Evidence HRG: 7/25/2019 - Amended Objections to Evidence Comment HRG: 7/25/2019 - Amended Objections to Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by FAX of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by FAX of REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER INSTRUCTING THE REFEREE TO SELL T Comment REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER INSTRUCTING THE REFEREE TO SELL THE ARATA PROPERTY WITHOUT RESERVING A LIFE ESTATE AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES;ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Reply. Additional Info: Declaration in Reply OF JOHN BRIGANTINO IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER INSTR Comment OF JOHN BRIGANTINO IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER INSTRUCTING THE REFEREE TO SELL THE ARATA PROPERTY WITHOUT RESERVING A LIFE ESTATE AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support. Additional Info: Declaration in Support SECOND DECLARATION OF THE HON. JOSEPH BIAFORE JR (RET) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION F Comment SECOND DECLARATION OF THE HON. JOSEPH BIAFORE JR (RET) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER INSTRUCTING REFEREE TO SELL THE ARATA RANCH WITHOUT RESERVING A LIFE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections to Evidence. Additional Info: Objections to Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Judicial Notice. Additional Info: Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER INSTRUCTING THE R Comment IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER INSTRUCTING THE REFEREE TO SELL THE ARATA PROPERTY WITHOUT RESERVING A LIFE ESTATE AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2015
  • Financial info for ARATA, LILLIAN LOUISE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • Financial: ARATA, LILLIAN LOUISE; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Financial info for ARATA, GARY J : Case Payment Receipt # 201412080615 ARATA, GARY J $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Financial info for ARATA, GARY J : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Financial: ARATA, GARY J; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201510010493 Payor $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201509140397 Payor $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Financial: Payor; Total Financial Assessment $1,365.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,365.00

    Read MoreRead Less