This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 05:13:51 (UTC).

FRED STUDER vs. NETSUITE, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2016 FRED STUDER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NETSUITE, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Karesh, Jonathan E, Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L, Karesh, Jonathan E. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0794

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Karesh, Jonathan E

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUDER, FRED

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

HAMMERLING, BROOKE

NETSUITE, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALEFSKY, CLIFF

Defendant Attorneys

Friedlander, Steven L.

SCHULMAN, JANIE F.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee).

Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee) ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited

Proof of Service by.

Proof of Service by QUESTIONABLE- MAIL & ACKNOWLEGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE with a service date of Comment QUESTIONABLE- MAIL & ACKNOWLEGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE with a service date of 08/09/16. NO ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ATTACHED.

Document.

Document LETTER IN REGARDS TO THE MOTION SET ON 9/21/16 Comment LETTER IN REGARDS TO THE MOTION SET ON 9/21/16

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE COMPLAINT ETC Comment DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE COMPLAINT, ETC

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed IN SUPPORT OF DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE PLAINTI Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: SCHULMAN, JANIE F.

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order RE: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 092916 Comment RE: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 092916

Motion to Strike.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received RE: ORDER GRANTING DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE COMPLAINT Comment RE: ORDER GRANTING DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE COMPLAINT

Declaration.

Declaration OF JANIE SCHULMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE COMPLAINT. Comment OF JANIE SCHULMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFT NETSUITE INC.'S MOTION TO STIRKE COMPLAINT.

Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee).

Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee) TO STRIKE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE Comment TO STRIKE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, SERVED TO FANNY XIONG, AGENT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, SERVED TO FANNY XIONG, AGENT

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CASE DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 4-6-17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL. ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 21 ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial. Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2016
  • Financial info for NETSUITE, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-039842-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS INC $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Financial info for NETSUITE, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-039840-HOJ MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Financial info for NETSUITE, INC. : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Financial info for NETSUITE, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Financial: NETSUITE, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $485.00; Total Payments and Credits $485.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for STUDER, FRED : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-063194-HOJ PALEFSKY, CLIFF $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for STUDER, FRED : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Financial info for STUDER, FRED : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-034039-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Financial info for STUDER, FRED : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Financial: STUDER, FRED; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less