This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 02:45:22 (UTC).

Fred C. Petersen, et al vs. Cathlyn D Petersen, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Fred C Petersen, filed an Other lawsuit against Cathlyn D Petersen,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A, Weiner, Marie S and WEINER. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1313

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Weiner, Marie S

WEINER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Petersen, Neal J

Petersen, Fred C.

Defendants

Does 1-10

Petersen, Cathlyn D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUMMINS, JAMES R.

BARULICH, PAUL J.

Defendant Attorneys

FELLNER, JASON ELLIOT

GIRARDE, JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Appellant's Notice of Designation.

Appellant's Notice of Designation

Notice of Filing of Appeal.

Notice of Filing of Appeal

Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited.

Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Comment Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF CATHLYN D. PETERSEN'S MOTION T Comment REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF CATHLYN D. PETERSEN'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

Motion to Strike.

Motion to Strike DEFENDANT CATHYLN D. PETERSEN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PUR Comment DEFENDANT CATHYLN D. PETERSEN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF MONIKA PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFEND Comment DECLARATION OF MONIKA PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CATHLYN D. PETERSEN'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF JAMES R. CUMMINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFEN Comment DECLARATION OF JAMES R. CUMMINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CATHLYN D. PETERSEN'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

Supplemental.

Supplemental SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CATHYLYN D. PETERSEN P IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE COMPL Comment SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CATHYLYN D. PETERSEN P IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF FRED C. PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFEN Comment DECLARATION OF FRED C. PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CATHLYN D. PETERSEN'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal.

Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal First Appellate District Comment First Appellate District

Order.

Order DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE Comment DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE Comment ORDER DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Appellant's Notice of Designation.

Appellant's Notice of Designation

Notice of Filing of Appeal.

Notice of Filing of Appeal

Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited.

Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Comment Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal.; Additional Info: Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal First Appellate District Comment First Appellate District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE Comment DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE Comment ORDER DENYING SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Petersen, Cathlyn D; Case Payment Receipt # 2021-045316-HOJ Swift Attorney Service $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Petersen, Cathlyn D; Transaction Assessment $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCourt Reporter Processing Fee (Rule 8.130/8.834).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAppeal Case Number.; Additional Info: Comment A163726

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Petersen, Cathlyn D; Case Payment Receipt # 2021-042839-HOJ Nationwide Legal, LLC $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Petersen, Cathlyn D; Transaction Assessment $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Notice of Designation.; Additional Info: Appellant's Notice of Designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Petersen, Fred C.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-009907-HOJ Petersen, Fred C. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Petersen, Fred C.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Petersen, Fred C.; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less