This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/31/2022 at 01:36:38 (UTC).

FRANK PROPERTIES vs. REFFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 FRANK PROPERTIES filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against REFFERRAL DESIGN CONSTRUCTION, INC ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0416

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANK PROPERTIES

Defendants

DOES I THROUGH V, INCLUSIVE

REFFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC.

TITAN SOLAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned.

Writ of Possession Returned County: SAN MATEO Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 06/8/17 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 06/8/17

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF FILING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS A Comment Document: NOTICE OF FILING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER, NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED AND UNABLE TO FORWARD

Declaration Re: Daily Rental Value.

Declaration Re: Daily Rental Value $60.00 Comment $60.00

Judgment.

Judgment BY DEFAULT BY CLERK Comment BY DEFAULT BY CLERK

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS Reason Comment NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS Reason: UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO REFFERRAL DESIGN & C Comment NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO REFFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC Reason: ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD.

Writ of Possession Returned.

Writ of Possession Returned County: SAN MATEOStatus: Wholly SatisfiedIssued on: 06/8/17 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 06/8/17

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF FILING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS A Comment Document: NOTICE OF FILING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER, NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED AND UNABLE TO FORWARD

Declaration Re: Daily Rental Value.

Declaration Re: Daily Rental Value $60.00 Comment $60.00

Judgment.

Judgment BY DEFAULT BY CLERK Comment BY DEFAULT BY CLERK

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS Reason Comment NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS Reason: UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO REFFERRAL DESIGN & C Comment NOTICE OF FILING AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT AS TO REFFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC Reason: ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned.; Additional Info: Writ of Possession Returned County: SAN MATEOStatus: Wholly SatisfiedIssued on: 06/8/17 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 06/8/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned undelivered.; Additional Info: Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF FILING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS A Comment Document: NOTICE OF FILING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER, NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED AND UNABLE TO FORWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; FRANK PROPERTIES; REFFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC.; DOES I THROUGH V, INCLUSIVE; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To; FRANK PROPERTIES; Entitled to Possession of Premises at; 1960 LESLIE STREET SAN MATEO, CA 94403; Awarded Against; REFFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC.; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for FRANK PROPERTIES; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-041426-HOJ FRANK PROPERTIES $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for FRANK PROPERTIES; Transaction Assessment $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued.; Additional Info: Comment to the County of SAN MATEO Issued On: 6/8/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Daily Rental Value.; Additional Info: Declaration Re: Daily Rental Value $60.00 Comment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment.; Additional Info: Judgment BY DEFAULT BY CLERK Comment BY DEFAULT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice.; Additional Info: Unlawful Detainer Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for FRANK PROPERTIES; Transaction Assessment $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • FinancialFinancial; FRANK PROPERTIES; Total Financial Assessment $265.00; Total Payments and Credits $265.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketUD Case Remains Confidential.; Additional Info: Comment Reason: By Statute

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer.; Additional Info: Comment 1960 LESLIE STREET SAN MATEO CA 94403

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA GREEN PROS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.