This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:57:03 (UTC).

FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC VS ANTONIETTE TAMAYO

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTONIETTE TAMAYO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5891

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC

Defendants

ANTONIETTE TAMAYO

TAMAYO, ANTONIETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESAI, VIJAY S

Defendant Attorney

HIGBEE, MATHEW K

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment REQDNE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER ON 092112.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC AS TO ANTONIETTE TAMAYO BY SUB-SERVING BENJAMIN ANTONIO, FATHER/CO OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 08/14/12.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Stipulation filed.

STIPULATION Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT & ENTRY OF JDGMNT IN EVEN OF DFLT FILED

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited $10K to $25K.

ANSWER Comment ANS4: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC FILED BY ANTONIETTE TAMAYO REPRESENTED BY MATHEW K HIGBEE - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10,000.00

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER ON STIP FOR SETTLEMENT & ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT IN EVENT OF DEFAULT SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 07/24/13 FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ANTONIETTE TAMAYO.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: TAMAYO ANTONIETTE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: ORDER Comment O2: ORDER ON STIP FOR SETTLEMENT & ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT IN EVENT OF DEFAULT SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 07/24/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation filed. Additional Info: STIPULATION Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT & ENTRY OF JDGMNT IN EVEN OF DFLT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: ORDER SENT TO DEPT. 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130723-0820-CK 037/ 20.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP4: MOTION FEE PAID BY ANTONIETTE TAMAYO FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice. Additional Info: REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: REQUEST Comment REQDNE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER ON 092112.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120921-0732-CK 172/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120815-0365-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Financial info for TAMAYO, ANTONIETTE : Case Payment Receipt # 201209210732 TAMAYO, ANTONIETTE $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Financial info for TAMAYO, ANTONIETTE : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Financial: TAMAYO, ANTONIETTE; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial info for FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201208150365 FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial info for FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial: FORTIS CAPITAL IV LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less