This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/05/2022 at 09:18:33 (UTC).

FONG CHU SIT, et al vs. ALFRED KAI KWONG CHAN, et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 FONG CHU SIT filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ALFRED KAI KWONG CHAN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Buchwald, Gerald J., Buchwald, Gerald J, Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5671

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Buchwald, Gerald J

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LU, SHA

LIU, JULIA JL

WONG, KAREN ZHI LI

YUENG, CHI HING LEE

CHENG, MARGARET

WONG, PETER

TANG, XUE LIAN

TO, DUCTRI

LEE, VIVIAN

WONG, ELISIE

LEE, KAM DUEN

TAM, KWOK FAI

LEUNG, WAI PONG

MA, GEORGE GUO

TAN, ZIYING

WONG, CHUCK

Defendants

CHAN, ALFRED KAI KWONG

FOCAL POINT CONSULTING LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

FOCAL POINT FINANCIAL GROUP INC.

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEN, STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Declaration.

Declaration of STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS Comment of STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Declaration.

Declaration OF STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS Comment OF STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference on 8/22/2022 at 9:00 AM Comment Case Management Conference on 8/22/2022 at 9:00 AM

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/16/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEY

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/16/2022 at 9 AM Comment Case Management Conference - 2/16/2022 at 9 AM

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Declaration.

Declaration of STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS Comment of STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference on 8/22/2022 at 9:00 AM Comment Case Management Conference on 8/22/2022 at 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/16/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEYPlaintiffAttorney: SHEN, STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/16/2022 at 9 AM Comment Case Management Conference - 2/16/2022 at 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration of STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS Comment of STANLEY SHEN IN REGARD TO INTERNATIONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIT, FONG CHU; Case Payment Receipt # 2020-049578-HOJ SHEN LAW FIRM $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIT, FONG CHU; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; SIT, FONG CHU; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEN, STANLEY