This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 15:57:12 (UTC).

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY vs. REEGS, INC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against REEGS, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2366

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Defendants

Reegs, Inc.

REEGS, INC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FANT, PHILIP A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET COMPLAINT, SUMMONSPARTY SERVED K Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, SUMMONS PARTY SERVED KEITH MARLOW- OFFICE MANAGER- PERSON IN CHARGE OF THE OFFICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET COMPLAINT, SUMMONSPARTY SERVED K Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, SUMMONS PARTY SERVED KEITH MARLOW- OFFICE MANAGER- PERSON IN CHARGE OF THE OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-022286-HOJ Fireman's Fund Insurance Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fant, Philip Arlington